Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:09:38 (UTC).

Penman v. Morin

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Penman filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Morin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1506

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

ROGER E. PENMAN

Charleston, ME 04422-0000

Respondent / Appellee

JEFFREY MORIN, Superintendent, Mountain View Correctional Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Roger E. Penman

Attorney at Mountain View Correctional Facility

1182 Dover Rd

Charleston, ME 04422-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Donald W. Macomber

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

JUDGMENT entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. Denied [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:36 PM]

Open Document

LETTER sent to Appellant Roger E. Penman in response to his recent correspondence dated May 18, 2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:16 PM]

Open Document

ELECRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consisting of district court docket entry nos. 24, 25. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:43 PM]

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellant Roger E. Penman concerning record on appeal. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/27/2020 04:57 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Morin filed by Attorney Donald W. Macomber, AAG. Certificate of service dated 05/27/2020. [20-1506] (DWM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:31 AM]

Open Document

LETTER sent to Appellant Roger E. Penman in response to his recent correspondence dated May 10, 2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:51 PM]

Open Document

ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: April 27, 2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:12 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability, to remand case to district court filed by Appellant Roger E. Penman. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/15/2020 04:48 PM]

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellant Roger E. Penman concerning payment of filing fee. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/15/2020 12:42 PM]

Open Document #4

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #3

Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Litigants

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. Denied [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCASE submitted. Panel: Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. [20-1506] (KPC) [Entered: 07/07/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER sent to Appellant Roger E. Penman in response to his recent correspondence dated May 18, 2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consisting of district court docket entry nos. 24, 25. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER filed by Appellant Roger E. Penman concerning record on appeal. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/27/2020 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Morin filed by Attorney Donald W. Macomber, AAG. Certificate of service dated 05/27/2020. [20-1506] (DWM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER sent to Appellant Roger E. Penman in response to his recent correspondence dated May 10, 2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: April 27, 2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for certificate of appealability, to remand case to district court filed by Appellant Roger E. Penman. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/15/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketFiling fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Roger E. Penman on 05/15/2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/15/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER filed by Appellant Roger E. Penman concerning payment of filing fee. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2020. [20-1506] (CMP) [Entered: 05/15/2020 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #21) filed by Appellant Roger E. Penman. Fee due 05/28/2020. [20-1506] (MNH) [Entered: 05/14/2020 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONALD W. MACOMBER