This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/01/2022 at 05:18:02 (UTC).

Peloton Interactive, Inc. v. Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Peloton Interactive, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1586

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

PELOTON INTERACTIVE, INC.

Appellee

ECHELON FITNESS MULTIMEDIA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Jonathan M. Strang

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Appellee Attorney

Barry Schindler Esq.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A

500 Campus Drive, Po Box 677

Florham Park, NJ 07932-0677

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/29/2022. [839885] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/13/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/13/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/13/2022. Certified List is due on 05/09/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 03/30/2022 10:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peloton Interactive, Inc. is a litigant