This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/10/2021 at 06:10:27 (UTC).

Peggy Snyder v. DowDuPont Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Peggy Snyder filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against DowDuPont Inc,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1235

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOWDUPONT INC, a Delaware Corporation

EI DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC, a Delaware Corporation

Defendant / Appellee

EI DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO

Plaintiff / Appellant

PEGGY SNYDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John M. Nolan Esq.

John Scull Esq.

Margaret M. DiBianca Esq.

John M. Nolan Esq. III

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gary W. Aber Esq.

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

16 #1

Mediation Instructions

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #4

Exhibit No.3

7 #3

Exhibit No.2

7 #2

Exhibit No.1

7 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

#6

#5

#4

#3

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER (Clerk) It appears the pleadings in the district court named two defendants: DowDuPont and DuPont. In a so-called ordered stiplulation, the claims against Dow DuPont were dismissed and the caption was amended, to correct Dupont's corporate name. When this appeal was docketed, the caption included DuPont's name as it appeared before the amendment and DuPont's post-amendment name, as if they were two separate parties. To match the amended caption used by the district court, see Fed. R. App. P. 12(a), the caption of this appeal is hereby amended. According to the Appellees' letter, only DuPont will participate in ths appeal. Dow DuPont will therefore be maked as a non-participating appellee. (MB) [Entered: 03/17/2021 01:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney John M. Nolan, Esq. for Appellees DowDuPont Inc, EI DuPont de Nemours & Co and EI DuPont de Nemours Inc Letter to Court re Corporate Disclosure Statement. Certificate of Service dated 03/16/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1235] (JMN) [Entered: 03/16/2021 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FOLLOW UP LETTER to John M. Nolan, Esq. for DowDuPont Inc and EI DuPont de Nemours Inc, John M. Nolan, III, Esq. for DowDuPont Inc and EI DuPont de Nemours Inc and John Scull, Esq. for DowDuPont Inc and EI DuPont de Nemours Inc requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 03/17/2021. (MB) [Entered: 03/03/2021 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee EI DuPont de Nemours & Co. [21-1235] (JMN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gary W. Aber on behalf of Appellant(s) Pegy Snyder. [21-1235] (GWA) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Peggy Snyder advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-1235] (GWA) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Peggy Snyder. [21-1235] (GWA) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Peggy Snyder. [21-1235] (GWA) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Peggy Snyder. [21-1235] (GWA) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John Scull on behalf of Appellee(s) DowDupont, Inc., a Delaware Corporation and E.I. DuPont de Nemours, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. [21-1235] (JS) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John M. Nolan, III on behalf of Appellee(s) DowDupont, Inc., a Delaware Corporation and E.I. DuPont de Nemours, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. [21-1235] (JMN) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John M. Nolan on behalf of Appellee(s) DowDupont, Inc., a Delaware Corporation and E.I. DuPont de Nemours, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. [21-1235] (JMN) [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Gary W. Aber, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 02/24/2021. (AMR) [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Peggy Snyder in District Court No. 1-18-cv-01266. (AMR) [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less