This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 06:02:18 (UTC).

Peggy Rotstain, et al v. Trustmark National Bank, et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Peggy Rotstain filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Trustmark National Bank. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11131

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

OFFICIAL STANFORD INVESTORS COMMITTEE

Petitioner / Appellants

CARLOS BARBIERI

JANA L. AMYX

DORRIS BURCHETT

ANNALISA MENDEZ

GIANCARLO DELON

Defendant / Appellees

TRUSTMARK NATIONAL BANK

TORONTO-DOMINION BANK

BLAISE FRIEDLI

INDEPENDENT BANK, formerly known as Bank of Houston

SOCIETE GENERALE PRIVATE BANKING

SG PRIVATE BANKING (SUISSE) S.A.

HSBC BANK, P.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott M. Berman

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman, L.L.P.

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-6515

Joshua Eli Abraham Esq.

Attorney at Butzel Long, P.C.

477 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Peter Daniel Morgenstern Esq.

Attorney at Butzel Long, P.C.

477 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Constantine Z. Pamphilis

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, L.L.P.

1415 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robin C. Gibbs

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Scott Anthony Humphries

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Ashley McKeand Kleber Esq.

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Ellen Bush Sessions

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201-7932

Lynn K. Neuner

Attorney at Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, L.L.P.

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-3954

Charles Rodney Acker

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201-7932

Peter Eric Kazanoff

Attorney at Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, L.L.P.

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-3954

Brian A. Herman

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P.

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Ryan Coel Wooten

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, L.L.P.

609 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Paul Christopher Watler

Attorney at Jackson Walker, L.L.P.

2323 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Noelle M. Reed

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Allen L. Lanstra

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, L.L.P.

300 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-6858

Roger B. Cowie

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Taylor Freytag Brinkman

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

John K. Schwartz

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

600 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Scott M. Berman ) [Entered: 12/03/2019 10:40 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/06/2020 for Appellants Jana L. Amyx, Carlos Barbieri, Dorris Burchett, Giancarlo Delon and Annalisa Mendez. [19-11131] (CMB) [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian A. Herman for Mr. Blaise Friedli for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-11131] (Brian A. Herman ) [Entered: 11/25/2019 12:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Scott Anthony Humphries ) [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:34 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Ellen Bush Sessions ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:23 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Charles Rodney Acker ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Peter Eric Kazanoff ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-11131] (Lynn K. Neuner ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-11131] (Joshua Eli Abraham ) [Entered: 10/27/2019 11:42 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9171786-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 11/05/2019 for Appellants Jana L. Amyx, Carlos Barbieri, Dorris Burchett, Giancarlo Delon and Annalisa Mendez [19-11131] (MVM) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:24 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Jana L. Amyx, Mr. Carlos Barbieri, Ms. Dorris Burchett, Mr. Giancarlo Delon and Ms. Annalisa Mendez [19-11131] (CBW) [Entered: 10/15/2019 02:14 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Scott M. Berman for party(s) Appellee Official Stanford Investors Committee, in case 19-11131 [19-11131] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/03/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Scott M. Berman ) [Entered: 12/03/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian A. Herman for Appellee Blaise Friedli in 19-11131 [19-11131] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/06/2020 for Appellants Jana L. Amyx, Carlos Barbieri, Dorris Burchett, Giancarlo Delon and Annalisa Mendez. [19-11131] (CMB) [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-11131] (CMB) [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian A. Herman for Mr. Blaise Friedli for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-11131] (Brian A. Herman ) [Entered: 11/25/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Scott Anthony Humphries for party(s) Appellee Trustmark National Bank, in case 19-11131 [19-11131] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) John K. Schwartz for party(s) Appellee HSBC Bank, P.L.C., in case 19-11131 [19-11131] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/14/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Scott Anthony Humphries ) [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (John K. Schwartz ) [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Ellen Bush Sessions ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Charles Rodney Acker ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11131] (Peter Eric Kazanoff ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-11131] (Lynn K. Neuner ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:09-CV-2384. Electronic ROA due on 11/13/2019. [19-11131] (LEF) [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-11131] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Jana L. Amyx, Mr. Carlos Barbieri, Ms. Dorris Burchett, Mr. Giancarlo Delon and Ms. Annalisa Mendez advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 10/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cowie, Gibbs, Herman, Lanstra, Reed, Sessions, Watler, Wooten; Attorney for Appellant: Pamphilis [19-11131] (Constantine Z. Pamphilis ) [Entered: 10/28/2019 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-11131] (Joshua Eli Abraham ) [Entered: 10/27/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9171786-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 11/05/2019 for Appellants Jana L. Amyx, Carlos Barbieri, Dorris Burchett, Giancarlo Delon and Annalisa Mendez [19-11131] (MVM) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [19-11131] (CBW) [Entered: 10/15/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Jana L. Amyx, Mr. Carlos Barbieri, Ms. Dorris Burchett, Mr. Giancarlo Delon and Ms. Annalisa Mendez [19-11131] (CBW) [Entered: 10/15/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.