This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/12/2021 at 06:07:15 (UTC).

Pedro Orozco v. James Hession, et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Pedro Orozco filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against James Hession. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2663

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PEDRO OROZCO

Defendant / Appellees

JAMES HESSION

MONICA WILLIAMSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David G. Sigale

Attorney at LAW FIRM OF DAVID G. SIGALE, P.C.

430 W. Roosevelt Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jorie R. Johnson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE COOK COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY

50 W. Washington Street500 Richard J. Daley Center

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Pedro Orozco. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7186480] [21-2663] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 09/17/2021 06:03 PM]

#3

(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, October 5, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [7187038] [21-2663] (AD) [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:54 PM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/05/2021 for Pedro Orozco. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/06/2021 for James Hession and Monica Williamson. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/27/2021 for Appellant Pedro Orozco. RJS [7187040] [21-2663] (AD) [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:56 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Pedro Orozco. [5] [7188584] [21-2663] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 09/28/2021 01:22 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David G. Sigale for Appellant Pedro Orozco. [6] [7188585] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2663] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 09/28/2021 01:26 PM]

#7

(#7) Appearance form filed by Attorney Jorie R. Johnson for Appellees James Hession and Monica Williamson. [7] [7188726] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2663] (Johnson, Jorie) [Entered: 09/29/2021 08:59 AM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/15/2021 for Pedro Orozco. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/15/2021 for James Hession and Monica Williamson. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/05/2022 for Appellant Pedro Orozco. RJS [7188771] [21-2663] (ER) [Entered: 09/29/2021 09:41 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order.; Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee are directed to make a telephonic or electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 12/17/2021. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7192320] [21-2663] (AP) [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:02 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order.; Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee are directed to make a telephonic or electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 12/17/2021. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7192320] [21-2663] (AP) [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/15/2021 for Pedro Orozco. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/15/2021 for James Hession and Monica Williamson. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/05/2022 for Appellant Pedro Orozco. RJS [7188771] [21-2663] (ER) [Entered: 09/29/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Appearance form filed by Attorney Jorie R. Johnson for Appellees James Hession and Monica Williamson. [7] [7188726] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2663] (Johnson, Jorie) [Entered: 09/29/2021 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David G. Sigale for Appellant Pedro Orozco. [6] [7188585] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2663] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 09/28/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Pedro Orozco. [5] [7188584] [21-2663] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 09/28/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/05/2021 for Pedro Orozco. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/06/2021 for James Hession and Monica Williamson. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/27/2021 for Appellant Pedro Orozco. RJS [7187040] [21-2663] (AD) [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, October 5, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [7187038] [21-2663] (AD) [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Pedro Orozco. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7186480] [21-2663] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 09/17/2021 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Pedro Orozco by 09/17/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 09/27/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/25/2021 for Pedro Orozco. [1] [7185159] [21-2663] (CG) [Entered: 09/13/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less