This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2020 at 06:17:12 (UTC).

Pebble Tide LLC v. Arlo Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Pebble Tide LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arlo Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1523

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ARLO TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

PEBBLE TIDE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R. Eric Hutz

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1201 N Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

James Christopher Martin

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 Fifth Avenue, Reed Smith Centre

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Christine M. Morgan

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

John Bovich

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gerard M. Donovan

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1301 K Street, Nw, Suite 1100-East Tower

Washington, DC 20005

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis Esq.

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N West Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Isaac Philip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MOTION of Appellant Pebble Tide LLC to extend the time to 06/04/2020 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief, currently due on May 4, 2020. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/10/2020 by email. [685880] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 04/10/2020 10:07 AM]

#12

(#12) Entry of appearance for John P. Bovich as of counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681073] [20-1523] [John Bovich] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:36 PM]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for James C. Martin as of counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681017] [20-1523] [James Martin] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:47 PM]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for Gerard M. Donovan as of counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679660] [20-1523] [Gerard Donovan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:30 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679658] [20-1523] [Christine Morgan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:15 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679656] [20-1523] [Christine Morgan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:14 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Christine M. Morgan as principal counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679655] [20-1523] [Christine Morgan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:11 PM]

#6

(#6) Corrected Entry of appearance for Isaac Philip Rabicoff as principal counsel for Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/13/2020 by email. [678493] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/13/2020 10:04 AM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/10/2020 by email. [677582] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:39 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/10/2020 by email. [677580] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:38 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Isaac Philip Rabicoff as principal counsel for Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/10/2020 by email. [677576] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:36 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 13 ], ERROR: Appellant's motion did not include a Certificate of Interest or Certificate of Compliance. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FCR 47.4(b), motions must contain a Certificate of Interest. Pursuant to FRAP 32(g)(1), motions must contain a Certificate of Compliance with a word count. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [686044] [LMN] [Entered: 04/10/2020 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. The opening brief is due 06/04/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [686040] [LMN] [Entered: 04/10/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION of Appellant Pebble Tide LLC to extend the time to 06/04/2020 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief, currently due on May 4, 2020. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/10/2020 by email. [685880] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 04/10/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Entry of appearance for John P. Bovich as of counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681073] [20-1523] [John Bovich] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for James C. Martin as of counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681017] [20-1523] [James Martin] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Gerard M. Donovan as of counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679660] [20-1523] [Gerard Donovan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679658] [20-1523] [Christine Morgan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679656] [20-1523] [Christine Morgan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Christine M. Morgan as principal counsel for Appellee Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679655] [20-1523] [Christine Morgan] [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected Entry of appearance for Isaac Philip Rabicoff as principal counsel for Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/13/2020 by email. [678493] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/13/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#5) REMINDER : Isaac Rabicoff is reminded that the information on the entry of appearance (EOA) and the information in the user account must match. Please update the EOA or the account promptly . [678287] [MMA] [Entered: 03/12/2020 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/10/2020 by email. [677582] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/10/2020 by email. [677580] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Isaac Philip Rabicoff as principal counsel for Appellant Pebble Tide LLC. Service: 03/10/2020 by email. [677576] [20-1523] [Isaac Rabicoff] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/24/2020. [675749] Entry of Appearance due 03/17/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/17/2020. Docketing Statement due 03/17/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/04/2020. [MMA] [Entered: 03/03/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arlo Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PEBBLE TIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff