This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/13/2021 at 13:32:49 (UTC).

PDVSA US Litigation Trust v. Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 PDVSA US Litigation Trust filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11133

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PDVSA US LITIGATION TRUST

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellees

VITOL ENERGY (BERMUDA) LTD.

LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS, LLC

VITOL, INC.

COLONIAL GROUP, INC.

TRAFIGURA TRADING LLC

JOSE LAROCCA

GLENCORE, LTD.

COLONIAL OIL INDUSTRIES, INC.

LUKOIL PETROLEUM, LTD.

ANTONIO MAARRAOUI

MARIA FERNANDA RODRIGUEZ

BAC FLORIDA BANK

GUSTAVO GABALDON

LEONARDO BAQUERO

GLENCORE ENERGY UK LTD.

LUIS ALVAREZ

FRANCISCO MORILLO

HELSINGE, INC.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Boies

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

333 Main St

Armonk, NY 10504

Not Classified By Court and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas P. McLish

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stacey H. Mitchell

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Weston Lee O'Black

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana St Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

George Thomas Breur

Attorney at Welbaum Guernsey

901 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Brian Andrew Briz

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131

Mikayla Kiersten Espinosa

Attorney at Gelber Schachter & Greenberg, PA

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33131-1715

Mark J. MacDougall

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Neal Stuart Manne

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana St Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Christina Olivos

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Dr Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Kimberly A. Pathman

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Spencer H. Silverglate

Attorney at Clarke Silverglate, PA

799 Brickell Plz Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Alice K. Sum

Attorney at U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Ave Ste 1800

Miami, FL 33131-2982

Adam Hudes

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Jonathan H. Kaskel

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, PA

600 Brickell Ave Ste 3500

Miami, FL 33131

Michael Patrick Lennon Jr.

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

700 Louisiana St Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2730

David Michael Burkoff

Attorney at Hunter Maclean Exley & Dunn, PC

200 E Saint Julian St, Po Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412

Benjamine Reid

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Jessica S. Carey

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019

Brad S. Karp

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019

44 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

USDC order on limited remand as to Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust filed on 11/30/2021. Docket Entry 750. [Entered: 12/06/2021 09:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marshall Dore Louis, Esq., Counsel for PDVSA US Litigation Trust [20-11133] (ECF: Marshall Louis) [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:30 AM]

Open Document #3

Appellees' Joint Supplemental Appendix Volume No. 3 (SEALED)

Open Document #2

Appellees' Joint Supplemental Appendix Volume No. 2

Open Document #1

Appellees' Joint Supplemental Appendix Volume No. 1

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document #1

CLK-3

Open Document

MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Freddy Funes for Appellees Antonio Maarraoui, Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd. and Vitol, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed [9493532-1] [20-11133] (ECF: Freddy Funes) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:11 PM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #685

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPublic Communication: Appellant's reply brief is due on 12/21/2021 as to Party PDVSA US Litigation Trust. [Entered: 12/06/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order on limited remand as to Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust filed on 11/30/2021. Docket Entry 750. [Entered: 12/06/2021 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marshall Dore Louis, Esq., Counsel for PDVSA US Litigation Trust [20-11133] (ECF: Marshall Louis) [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellees Luis Alvarez, BAC Florida Bank, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Sergio de la Vega. 3 VOLUMES with VOLUME #3 SEALED - 2 COPIES [Entered: 10/05/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Appendix [3 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore, Ltd.. [20-11133] (ECF: Bruce Birenboim) [Entered: 10/01/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Before the Court are: (1) Appellants Motion to Remand for Limited Purpose and (2) the Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of Appellees. Appellants Motion to Remand for Limited Purpose is GRANTED. The Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of Appellees is GRANTED to the extent that the response brief deadline is set for 30 days after the date that the district court issues its order on limited remand. [ # 9484947-2 ] [ # 9480531-2 ] JP and ALB (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 10/01/2021 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Freddy Funes is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9493532-2 ] Attorney terminated: Attorney Freddy Funes for Appellees Vitol, Inc., Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd. and Antonio Maarraoui in 20-11133. [Entered: 09/28/2021 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellant's Reply Brief is due on 11/15/2021. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 09/28/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees Luis Alvarez, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd., Glencore, Ltd. and Sergio de la Vega. [Entered: 09/28/2021 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Freddy Funes for Appellees Antonio Maarraoui, Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd. and Vitol, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed [9493532-1] [20-11133] (ECF: Freddy Funes) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Burck for Trafigura Trading, LLC and Jose Larooca [20-11133] (ECF: Edward Mullins) [Entered: 03/30/2020 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward M. Mullins for Trafigura Trading, LLC and Jose Larooca [20-11133] (ECF: Edward Mullins) [Entered: 03/30/2020 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Freddy Funes - Vitol Inc., Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd., Antonio Maarraoui [20-11133] (ECF: Freddy Funes) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gerald Edward Greenberg for Service. [20-11133] (ECF: Gerald Greenberg) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Weston Lee O'Black for Service. [20-11133] (ECF: Weston O'Black) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Gervais for Vitol Inc., Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd., Antonio Maarraoui [20-11133] (ECF: Michael Gervais) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Neal Stuart Manne for Service. [20-11133] (ECF: Neal Manne) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alex Kaplan for Vitol Inc., Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd., Antonio Maarraoui [20-11133] (ECF: Alexander Kaplan) [Entered: 03/30/2020 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael C. Kelso for Service. [20-11133] (ECF: Michael Kelso) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust on 03/19/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/04/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/06/2020 as to Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/20/2020 as to Appellee Colonial Group, Inc. [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PDVSA US LITIGATION TRUST is a litigant