This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/12/2019 at 06:09:03 (UTC).

PDVSA US Litigation Trust v. Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 PDVSA US Litigation Trust filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10950

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PDVSA US LITIGATION TRUST

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

BANK OF AMERICA CORP.

Defendant / Appellees

MARIA FERNANDA RODRIGUEZ

LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS, LLC

VITOL, INC.

HELSINGE LTD., SAINT-HELIER

COLONIAL GROUP, INC.

TRAFIGURA TRADING LLC

COLONIAL OIL INDUSTRIES, INC.

LUKOIL PETROLEUM, LTD.

LEONARDO BAQUERO

JOSE LAROCCA

ANTONIO MAARRAOUI

FRANCISCO MORILLO

HELSINGE, INC.

VITOL ENERGY (BERMUDA) LTD.

HELSINGE HOLDINGS, LLC

JOHN RYAN

LUIS LIENDO

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephen N. Zack

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131-2124

Not Classified By Court and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christina Olivos

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Dr Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Thomas P. McLish

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Mikayla Kiersten Espinosa

Attorney at Gelber Schachter & Greenberg, PA

1221 Brickell Ave Ste 2010

Miami, FL 33131

Stacey H. Mitchell

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jessica S. Carey

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019-6064

David Kully

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131

George Thomas Breur

Attorney at Welbaum Guernsey

901 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Kimberly A. Pathman

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Weston Lee O'Black

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana St Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Mark J. MacDougall

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Spencer H. Silverglate

Attorney at Clarke Silverglate, PA

799 Brickell Plz Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131-2805

Catherine A. O'Connor

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Adam L. Hudes

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jonathan H. Kaskel

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, PA

600 Brickell Ave Ste 3500

Miami, FL 33131

David Michael Burkoff

Attorney at Hunter Maclean Exley & Dunn, PC

200 E Saint Julian St, Po Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412-0048

Benjamine Reid

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Lide E. Paterno

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Brad S. Karp

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019-6064

Maxwell Kosman

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019-6064

50 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #679

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

53 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by PDVSA US Litigation Trust. [19-10950] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George F. Carpinello for PDVSA US Litigation Trust. [19-10950] (ECF: George Carpinello) [Entered: 04/30/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mrs. Teresa A. Monroe for PDVSA US Litigation Trust. [19-10950] (ECF: Teresa Monroe) [Entered: 04/30/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Neal Stuart Manne for Service. [19-10950] (ECF: Neal Manne) [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Weston Lee O'Black for Service. [19-10950] (ECF: Weston O'Black) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Hudes for Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. [19-10950] (ECF: Adam Hudes) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher N. Bellows for Helsinge, Inc.; Helsinge Ltd., St. Helier; Helsinge Holdings, LLC; Daniel Lutz; Luis Liendo and Maria Fernanda Rodriguez [19-10950] (ECF: Christopher Bellows) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Gervais for Vitol Inc., Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd., Antonio Maarraoui Michael Gervais for Service. [19-10950] (ECF: Michael Gervais) [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael C. Kelso for Service. [19-10950] (ECF: Michael Kelso) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Israel Jovanny Encinosa for Service. [19-10950] (ECF: Israel Encinosa) [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Andrew Briz for Service. [19-10950] (ECF: Brian Briz) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alex Mario Gonzalez for Service. [19-10950] (ECF: Alex Gonzalez) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allan Charles Galis for Colonial Group, Inc. and Colonial Oil Industries, Inc.. [19-10950] (ECF: Allan Galis) [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Michael Burkoff for Colonial Group, Inc. and Colonial Oil Industries, Inc.. [19-10950] (ECF: David Burkoff) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 03/22/2019 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Steven W. Davis for Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Steven W. Davis for Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-10950] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven W. Davis for PDVSA US Litigation Trust. [19-10950] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust on 03/11/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/27/2019 as to Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/10/2019 as to Appellee Colonial Group, Inc. [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PDVSA US LITIGATION TRUST is a litigant