This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/24/2019 at 06:11:19 (UTC).

PDVSA US Litigation Trust v. Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 PDVSA US Litigation Trust filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11124

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PDVSA US LITIGATION TRUST

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellees

LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS, LLC

COLONIAL GROUP, INC.

GLENCORE, LTD.

COLONIAL OIL INDUSTRIES, INC.

LUKOIL PETROLEUM, LTD.

LEONARDO BAQUERO

VITOL ENERGY (BERMUDA) LTD.

MARIA FERNANDA RODRIGUEZ

HELSINGE HOLDINGS, LLC

FRANCISCO MORILLO

HELSINGE, INC.

LUIS LIENDO

VITOL, INC.

DANIEL LUTZ

TRAFIGURA TRADING LLC

JOSE LAROCCA

HELSINGE LTD.

ANTONIO MAARRAOUI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephen N. Zack

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131-2124

Not Classified By Court and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Weston O'Black

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana St Ste 5000

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas P. McLish

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Mikayla Kiersten Espinosa

Attorney at Gelber Schachter & Greenberg, PA

1221 Brickell Ave Ste 2010

Miami, FL 33131

Stacey H. Mitchell

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jessica S. Carey

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019-6064

David Kully

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131

George Thomas Breur

Attorney at Welbaum Guernsey

901 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Kimberly A. Pathman

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Mark J. MacDougall

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Spencer H. Silverglate

Attorney at Clarke Silverglate, PA

799 Brickell Plz Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131-2805

Lara O'Donnell Grillo

Attorney at Mark Migdal & Hayden

80 Sw 8Th St Ste 1999

Miami, FL 33131

Christina Olivos

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Dr Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Adam L. Hudes

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jonathan H. Kaskel

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, PA

600 Brickell Ave Ste 3500

Miami, FL 33131

David Michael Burkoff

Attorney at Hunter Maclean Exley & Dunn, PC

200 E Saint Julian St, Po Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412-0048

Benjamine Reid

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Brad S. Karp

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019-6064

Robert C. Josefsberg

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Maxwell Kosman

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019-6064

47 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document #1

DIS-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC Order DE #685

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #684

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction and as duplicative of appeal No. 19-10950. GBT, AJ and ELB [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail was received for Attorney George Thomas Breur for Not Party Service. Return to sender, attempted - not known, unalble to forward. IN RE: DKT-2 letter. [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Neal Stuart Manne for Service. [19-11124] (ECF: Neal Manne) [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Thomas P. McLish is GRANTED by clerk. [8754116-2] [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Stacey H. Mitchell is GRANTED by clerk. [8754073-2] [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Thomas P. McLish for Not Party Service. [8754116-1] [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Stacey H. Mitchell for Not Party Service. [8754073-1] [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Weston Lee O'Black for Service. [19-11124] (ECF: Weston O'Black) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Hudes for Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. [19-11124] (ECF: Adam Hudes) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Edward M. Mullins for Trafigura Trading, LLC and Jose Larocca. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11124] (ECF: Edward Mullins) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail was received for Attorney Maria Christina Cardenas for Not Party Service. Return to sender, attempted, not known, unable to forward. IN RE: DKT-2 letter. [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan H. Kaskel for Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. [19-11124] (ECF: Jonathan Kaskel) [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jorge D. Guttman for Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. [19-11124] (ECF: Jorge Guttman) [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Spencer H. Silverglate for Service. Appearance form cannot be filed because you are not a member of the Court. [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen M. Medlock for Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. [19-11124] (ECF: Stephen Medlock) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Spencer H. Silverglate for Service. [19-11124] (ECF: Spencer Silverglate) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lide E. Paterno for Leonardo Baquero and Francisco Morillo [19-11124] (ECF: Lide Paterno) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Steven W. Davis for Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11124] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven W. Davis for PDVSA US Litigation Trust. [19-11124] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust on 03/22/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/08/2019 as to Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/22/2019 as to Appellee Colonial Group, Inc. [Entered: 03/29/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VITOL ENERGY (BERMUDA) LTD. is a litigant