This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/01/2022 at 06:17:22 (UTC).

PDVSA US Litigation Trust, et al v. Lukoil Pan Americas LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 PDVSA US Litigation Trust filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Lukoil Pan Americas LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10675

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PDVSA US LITIGATION TRUST

Intervenor

PETROLEOS DE VENEZUELA, S.A. (PDVSA)

Defendant / Appellees

LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS LLC

LUKOIL PETROLEUM LTD

COLONIAL OIL INDUSTRIES INC.

COLONIAL GROUP, INC.

GLENCORE LTD.

GLENCORE INTERNATIONAL A.G.

GLENCORE ENERGY UK LTD.

MASEFIELD A.G.

TRAFIGURA A.G.

TRAFIGURA TRADING LLC

TRAFIGURA BEHEER B.V.

VITOL ENERGY (BERMUDA) LTD.

VITOL S.A.

VITOL, INC.

FRANCISCO MORILLO

LEONARDO BAQUERO

DANIEL LUTZ

LUIS LIENDO

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Intervenor Attorneys

Marshall Dore Louis

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

Helen M. Maher

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

333 Main St

Armonk, NY 10504

Adam Shaw

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP.

30 S Pearl St 11Th Fl

Albany, NY 12207

David A. Barrett

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

55 Hudson Yards Fl 20

New York, NY 10001

David Boies

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

333 Main St

Armonk, NY 10504

George F. Carpinello

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP.

30 S Pearl St 11Th Fl

Albany, NY 12207

Nicholas A. Gravante Jr.

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

55 Hudson Yards Fl 20

New York, NY 10001

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan H. Kaskel

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, PA

600 Brickell Ave Ste 3500

Miami, FL 33131

Michael Patrick Lennon Jr.

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

700 Louisiana St Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2730

Edward M. Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Dr Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Jorge D. Guttman

Attorney at Palm Beach County Attorney's Office

300 N Dixie Hwy Ste 359

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Adam Hudes

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Robert C. Josefsberg

Attorney at Podhurst Orseck, PA

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Stephen M. Medlock

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Mark W. Ryan

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

David Michael Burkoff

Attorney at Hunter Maclean Exley & Dunn, PC

200 E Saint Julian St, Po Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412

Allan Charles Galis

Attorney at Hunter Maclean Exley & Dunn, PC

200 E Saint Julian St, Po Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412

Clifton Richard Gruhn

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Benjamine Reid

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Bruce Birenboim

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas Rm 200

New York, NY 10019

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren V. Purdy for Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC [22-10675] (ECF: Lauren Purdy) [Entered: 04/28/2022 05:31 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Marshall Dore Louis for Appellants Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (PDVSA). [Entered: 04/07/2022 03:26 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (PDVSA) is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9628738-2 ] [Entered: 04/07/2022 03:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher N. Bellows for Helsinge, Inc., Helsinge Holdings, LLC, Daniel Lutz, Luis Liendo and Maria Fernanda Rodriguez [22-10675] (ECF: Christopher Bellows) [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:46 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark J. MacDougall for Appellees Leonardo Baquero and Francisco Morillo. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Mark MacDougall) [Entered: 04/01/2022 05:34 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michael C. Kelso for Vitol Inc., Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd., and Antonio Maarraoui Attorney Michael C. Kelso for Appellees Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd. and Vitol, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Michael Kelso) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:25 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bruce Birenboim for Appellees Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Bruce Birenboim) [Entered: 04/01/2022 02:03 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Michael Burkoff for Appellees Colonial Group, Inc., Colonial Oil Industries Inc. and Paul Rosado. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: David Burkoff) [Entered: 04/01/2022 08:54 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jessica S. Carey for Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. [22-10675] (ECF: Jessica Carey) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lide E. Paterno for Leonardo Baquero and Francisco Morillo [22-10675] (ECF: Lide Paterno) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:09 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark J. MacDougall for Leonardo Baquero and Francisco Morillo. [22-10675] (ECF: Mark MacDougall) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bruce Birenboim for Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. [22-10675] (ECF: Bruce Birenboim) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brad S. Karp for Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. [22-10675] (ECF: Brad Karp) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:02 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marshall Dore Louis for Appellants PDVSA US Litigation Trust and Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (PDVSA). On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Marshall Louis) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:29 PM]

Open Document #3

DC Order doc 755

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren V. Purdy for Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC [22-10675] (ECF: Lauren Purdy) [Entered: 04/28/2022 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 04/11/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Marshall Dore Louis for Appellants Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (PDVSA). [Entered: 04/07/2022 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (PDVSA) is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9628738-2 ] [Entered: 04/07/2022 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher N. Bellows for Helsinge, Inc., Helsinge Holdings, LLC, Daniel Lutz, Luis Liendo and Maria Fernanda Rodriguez [22-10675] (ECF: Christopher Bellows) [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark J. MacDougall for Appellees Leonardo Baquero and Francisco Morillo. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Mark MacDougall) [Entered: 04/01/2022 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michael C. Kelso for Vitol Inc., Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd., and Antonio Maarraoui Attorney Michael C. Kelso for Appellees Vitol Energy (Bermuda) Ltd. and Vitol, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Michael Kelso) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bruce Birenboim for Appellees Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Bruce Birenboim) [Entered: 04/01/2022 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Michael Burkoff for Appellees Colonial Group, Inc., Colonial Oil Industries Inc. and Paul Rosado. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: David Burkoff) [Entered: 04/01/2022 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jonathan H. Kaskel for Appellee Lukoil Pan Americas LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Jonathan Kaskel) [Entered: 03/30/2022 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jorge D. Guttman for Lukoil Pan Americas LLC. [22-10675] (ECF: Jonathan Kaskel) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan H. Kaskel for Lukoil Pan Americas LLC. [22-10675] (ECF: Jonathan Kaskel) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristina A. Bunting for Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. [22-10675] (ECF: Kristina Bunting) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jessica S. Carey for Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. [22-10675] (ECF: Jessica Carey) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lide E. Paterno for Leonardo Baquero and Francisco Morillo [22-10675] (ECF: Lide Paterno) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark J. MacDougall for Leonardo Baquero and Francisco Morillo. [22-10675] (ECF: Mark MacDougall) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bruce Birenboim for Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. [22-10675] (ECF: Bruce Birenboim) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brad S. Karp for Luis Alvarez, Sergio de la Vega, Gustavo Gabaldon, Glencore Energy UK Ltd. and Glencore Ltd.. [22-10675] (ECF: Brad Karp) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marshall Dore Louis for Appellants PDVSA US Litigation Trust and Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (PDVSA). On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10675] (ECF: Marshall Louis) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants PDVSA US Litigation Trust and Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (PDVSA) on 03/01/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/18/2022 as to Appellant PDVSA US Litigation Trust. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/01/2022 as to Appellees. [Entered: 03/04/2022 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trafigura AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Glencore International AG is a litigant

Latest cases where PDVSA US LITIGATION TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL GROUP, INC. is a litigant