This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/06/2021 at 06:11:26 (UTC).

PAVO Solutions LLC v. Kingston Technology Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 PAVO Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kingston Technology Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1834

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

PAVO SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, One Congress Plaza, 4Th Floor

Austin, TX 78701

Michael John Ballanco Esq.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Brianna Lee Chamberlin

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin T. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacob Buczko

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew D. Weiss

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc Aaron Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Chan

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Adam Hoffman

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for Jacob R. Buczko as counsel for Appellee PAVO Solutions LLC. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772904] [21-1834] [Jacob Buczko] [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. The opening brief is due 07/22/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [770736] [KMH] [Entered: 04/23/2021 09:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION of Appellant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. to extend the time to 07/22/2021 to file brief. Service: 04/22/2021 by email. [770646] [21-1834] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee PAVO Solutions LLC. Service: 04/21/2021 by email. [770394] [21-1834] [Benjamin Wang] [Entered: 04/21/2021 06:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellee PAVO Solutions LLC. Service: 04/21/2021 by email. [770393] [21-1834] [Benjamin Wang] [Entered: 04/21/2021 06:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Benjamin T. Wang; Adam S. Hoffman; Andrew D. Weiss; Minna Y. Chan; Marc A. Fenster as counsel for Appellee PAVO Solutions LLC. Service: 04/21/2021 by email. [770390] [21-1834] [Benjamin Wang] [Entered: 04/21/2021 06:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. Service: 04/21/2021 by email. [770329] [21-1834] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 04/21/2021 05:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. Service: 04/21/2021 by email. [770327] [21-1834] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 04/21/2021 05:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for David Hoffman; Brianna L. Chamberlin; Michael J. Ballanco as counsel for Appellant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. Service: 04/21/2021 by email. [770324] [21-1834] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 04/21/2021 05:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 04/12/2021 by email. [768124] [21-1834] [David Hoffman] [Entered: 04/12/2021 05:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/31/2021. [767276] Entry of Appearance is due 04/21/2021. Certificate of Interest is due 04/21/2021. Docketing Statement is due 04/21/2021. Appellant's brief is due 06/07/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 04/07/2021 12:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin T Wang