This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/15/2022 at 01:17:19 (UTC).

Paula Thomas, et al v. Stephen Choi, et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Paula Thomas, filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Stephen Choi,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55124

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KENNETH W. CHUNG

JOSEPH EUTENEUER

ROBERT SILVER

ALAN B. MITCHEL

STEPHEN CHOI, AKA Hillshore Investment, S.A., (Dummy Corporation)

EDWARD KAMINSKY

KRING & CHUNG, LLP

GREENBERG GLUSTER

STEVE PRESTEMON

KYU HONG KIM, CPA, INC.

LAURA BOOTH

DESNA INVESTMENTS, LLC

LAW FIRM IN CALIFORNIA, NOLAN HIEMANN, Law Firm in California

Plaintiff / Appellant

THOMAS WYLDE, LLC, a California LLC

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Glen Robert Olson Esquire

Attorney at Long & Levit, LLP

465 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jonathan Rizzardi Esquire

Attorney at Rizzardi Law

51 Arabian Court

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Dean E. Dennis

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burrill, LLP

300 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Elissa Linden Gysi

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burrill, LLP

300 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Kevin H. Brogan

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burrill, LLP

300 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Richard Byron Peddie

Attorney at Richard Byron Peddie, P.C.

5051 Euclid Avenue

Boulder, CO 80303

Michael Wilk Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 W 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Artiano

Attorney at Artiano & Associates, APC

3828 Carson Street, Suite 102

Torrance, CA 90503

Lawrence Steven Andrews Esquire

Attorney at Artiano & Associates, APC

3828 Carson Street, Suite 102

Torrance, CA 90503

Jennifer Elizabeth Newcomb

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Robert Scott Silver

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dimitrios P. Biller

Attorney at Dimitrios P. Biller

15113 W Sunset Boulevard, Suite 9

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Other Attorneys

J. Andrew Wright

Attorney at Chapman Glucksman Dean & Roeb APC

11900 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Jon A. Weininger

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell, LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#58

(#58) MANDATE ISSUED.(WAF, JBR and JBO) Costs taxed against Appellant. In appeal 21-55069, appellees Jene Park and Thomas Wylde, LLCs bill of costs in the amount of $129.30 is granted. In appeal 21-55124, appellee Thomas Wylde, LLCs bill of costs in the amount of $124.50 is granted. [12360912] [21-55069, 21-55124] (RL) [Entered: 02/04/2022 11:13 AM]

#57

(#57) Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JOHN B. OWENS) The Petition for Rehearing of January 13, 2022 Memorandum, filed January 24, 2022, is DENIED. [12353682] [21-55069, 21-55124] (OC) [Entered: 01/27/2022 03:27 PM]

#56

(#56) Filed (ECF) Appellee Thomas Wylde, LLC bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 124.50 USD. Date of service: 01/25/2022 [12350689] [21-55124] (Peddie, Richard) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:21 PM]

55 #2

Post Judgment Form

55 #1

Memorandum

#54

(#54) Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JOHN B. OWENS) Appellants unopposed Motion for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 12070581-0 ], filed April 12, 2021, is GRANTED. Appellants unopposed Motion for Judicial Notice of Pleadings, Docket No. [ # 12077729-0 ], filed April 16, 2021, is GRANTED. Thomas Wylde, LLCs unopposed Request for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 21 ], filed March 31, 2021 (in Case. No. 21-55124) is GRANTED, with the exception of the Declaration from James Artiano that is not part of the public record. Thomas Wylde, LLCs & Jene Parks unopposed Request for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 12112719-0 ], filed May 13, 2021, is GRANTED, with the exception of the Declaration from James Artiano that is not part of the public record. Appellants Motion for Non-Monetary Sanctions, Docket No. [ # 12116955-0 ], filed May 18, 2021, is DENIED. Thomas Wylde, LLCs & Jene Parks Request for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 12126100-0 ], filed May 26, 2021, is DENIED as moot. [12313042] [21-55069, 21-55124] (OC) [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:30 PM]

#52

(#52) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The Court is of the unanimous opinion that the facts and legal arguments are adequately presented in the briefs and records and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument. Therefore, this case is ordered submitted without oral argument on December 6, 2021, at Pasadena, California. Appellant Thomas Wylde, LLCs Motions for Equal Time at Ninth Circuit Hearing, in both Case Nos. 21-55069 and 21-55124, filed November 16, 2021, are DENIED as moot. [12297150] [21-55069, 21-55124] (AF) [Entered: 11/23/2021 04:18 PM]

#49

(#49) Filed (ECF) Appellants PDTW, LLC, Paula Thomas and Thomas Wylde, LLC Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Appellant to have equal time as Appellees and other Defendants have requested]. Date of service: 11/16/2021. [12289917] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 21-55069 only.] (TYL) [Entered: 11/17/2021 10:17 AM]

#21

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MANDATE ISSUED.(WAF, JBR and JBO) Costs taxed against Appellant. In appeal 21-55069, appellees Jene Park and Thomas Wylde, LLCs bill of costs in the amount of $129.30 is granted. In appeal 21-55124, appellee Thomas Wylde, LLCs bill of costs in the amount of $124.50 is granted. [12360912] [21-55069, 21-55124] (RL) [Entered: 02/04/2022 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JOHN B. OWENS) The Petition for Rehearing of January 13, 2022 Memorandum, filed January 24, 2022, is DENIED. [12353682] [21-55069, 21-55124] (OC) [Entered: 01/27/2022 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Filed (ECF) Appellee Thomas Wylde, LLC bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 124.50 USD. Date of service: 01/25/2022 [12350689] [21-55124] (Peddie, Richard) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JOHN B. OWENS) Appeal No. 21-55124 is DISMISSED; Appeal No. 21-55069 is DISMISSED in part and AFFIRMED in part. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12339786] [21-55069, 21-55124] (MM) [Entered: 01/13/2022 09:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JOHN B. OWENS) Appellants unopposed Motion for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 12070581-0 ], filed April 12, 2021, is GRANTED. Appellants unopposed Motion for Judicial Notice of Pleadings, Docket No. [ # 12077729-0 ], filed April 16, 2021, is GRANTED. Thomas Wylde, LLCs unopposed Request for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 21 ], filed March 31, 2021 (in Case. No. 21-55124) is GRANTED, with the exception of the Declaration from James Artiano that is not part of the public record. Thomas Wylde, LLCs & Jene Parks unopposed Request for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 12112719-0 ], filed May 13, 2021, is GRANTED, with the exception of the Declaration from James Artiano that is not part of the public record. Appellants Motion for Non-Monetary Sanctions, Docket No. [ # 12116955-0 ], filed May 18, 2021, is DENIED. Thomas Wylde, LLCs & Jene Parks Request for Judicial Notice, Docket No. [ # 12126100-0 ], filed May 26, 2021, is DENIED as moot. [12313042] [21-55069, 21-55124] (OC) [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#53) SUBMITTED ON THE BRIEFS TO WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JOHN B. OWENS. [12306422] [21-55069, 21-55124] (BG) [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The Court is of the unanimous opinion that the facts and legal arguments are adequately presented in the briefs and records and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument. Therefore, this case is ordered submitted without oral argument on December 6, 2021, at Pasadena, California. Appellant Thomas Wylde, LLCs Motions for Equal Time at Ninth Circuit Hearing, in both Case Nos. 21-55069 and 21-55124, filed November 16, 2021, are DENIED as moot. [12297150] [21-55069, 21-55124] (AF) [Entered: 11/23/2021 04:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#51) Added Attorney(s) Kevin H. Brogan for party(s) Appellee Andrew Alpheberg Appellee Greenberg Gluster, in case 21-55124. [12290700] (RR) [Entered: 11/17/2021 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#50) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kevin H. Brogan (Hill Farrer & Burrill, LLP, 300 S. Grand Avenue, 37th Fl., Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellees Andrew Alpheberg and Greenberg Gluster. Date of service: 11/17/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12290309] [21-55124] (Brogan, Kevin) [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Filed (ECF) Appellants PDTW, LLC, Paula Thomas and Thomas Wylde, LLC Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Appellant to have equal time as Appellees and other Defendants have requested]. Date of service: 11/16/2021. [12289917] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 21-55069 only.] (TYL) [Entered: 11/17/2021 10:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants PDTW, LLC, Thomas Wylde, LLC, Paula Thomas. Date of service: 03/08/2021. [12027912] [21-55124]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of the excerpts, vols 1-22, and index volume. Backdated to reflect original filing date. 03/11/2021 by KWG] (Biller, Dimitrios) [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants PDTW, LLC, Thomas Wylde, LLC and Paula Thomas. Date of service: 03/03/2021. [12023590] [21-55124]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of the brief. Removed PDF of the excerpts, filed correctly in [ # 11 ]. Updated docket text to reflect correct party filers. 03/11/2021 by KWG] (Biller, Dimitrios) [Entered: 03/03/2021 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12018752] (BLS) [Entered: 02/26/2021 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#7) COURT CORRECTION: Terminated Appellees Eric Choi, Choi Assocaite-In-Fact-Enterprise, Consumer Resource Network, Hillshore Investments, S.A., Misty Isaacson, Danny Kim, Launchpaid Communications, Law Office of David Schnider, Doug Lee, Pagter and Perry Isaacson, Thomas Wydle, LLC, Allyson Thompson, United Plus Insurance and Jay Yu in 21-55124 [12017067] (SLM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/03/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12016027] (BLS) [Entered: 02/24/2021 06:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12010909] (RR) [Entered: 02/22/2021 07:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12010899] (RR) [Entered: 02/22/2021 07:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellee Thomas Wydle, LLC Correspondence: NOTICE OF (1) THOMAS WYLDE, LLC's WITHDRAWAL / DISAVOWAL OF APPEAL; AND (2) CASE MISDESIGNATION. Date of service: 02/18/2021 [12008842] [21-55124] (Peddie, Richard) [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed February 12, 2021 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than March 12, 2021; the answering brief is due April 9, 2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12007371] (WL) [Entered: 02/17/2021 04:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12005117] (RT) [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMAS WYLDE, LLC, a California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Andrew Wright