This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/22/2020 at 06:05:27 (UTC).

Stafford v. Wilmington Trust Ntl Assn

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Stafford filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wilmington Trust Ntl Assn. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11075

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Wilmington Trust National Association, Not in its Individual Capacity, but solely, as trustee for MFRA Trust 2014-2 Servicing

Fay Servicing, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellants

Paul Stafford

Dallas, TX 75204

Telea Stafford

12923 Epps Field Road

Farmers Branch, TX 75234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Crystal G. Gibson

Attorney at Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Turner & Engel, L.L.P.

4004 Belt Line Road

Addison, TX 75001

Mark D. Hopkins

Attorney at Hopkins Law, P.L.L.C.

3 Lakeway Centre Court

Austin, TX 78734

Shelley Luan Hopkins

Attorney at Hopkins Law, P.L.L.C.

3 Lakeway Centre Court

Austin, TX 78734

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul Stafford

12923 Epps Field Road

Farmers Branch, TX 75234

Paul K. Stafford

Attorney at Stafford Law Firm, P.C.

3142 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75204

Telea Stafford

12923 Epps Field Road

Farmers Branch, TX 75234

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Paul K. Stafford for Appellant Telea Stafford in 20-11075, Attorney Paul K. Stafford for Appellant Paul Stafford in 20-11075 [20-11075] (CAS) [Entered: 12/17/2020 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Paul Stafford. Extension Granted to and including 01/27/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/27/2021 for Appellants Paul Stafford and Telea Stafford [20-11075] (CAS) [Entered: 12/17/2020 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Ms. Telea Stafford for filing Appellants' (Paul Stafford's & Telea Stafford's) Brief until 01/27/2021 [20-11075] (Paul K. Stafford ) [Entered: 12/17/2020 12:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAttorney Paul Stafford added as counsel of record for Appellant Telea Stafford in 20-11075 [20-11075] (AS) [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11075] (Paul K. Stafford ) [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/28/2020 for Appellants Paul Stafford and Telea Stafford. [20-11075] (RLL) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-11075] (RLL) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark D. Hopkins for Appellee Fay Servicing, L.L.C. in 20-11075, Attorney Mark D. Hopkins for Appellee Wilmington Trust National Association in 20-11075 [20-11075] (CAS) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Shelley Luan Hopkins for party(s) Appellee Fay Servicing, L.L.C. Appellee Wilmington Trust National Association, in case 20-11075 [20-11075] (CAS) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Crystal G. Gibson for Appellee Fay Servicing, L.L.C. in 20-11075, Attorney Crystal G. Gibson for Appellee Wilmington Trust National Association in 20-11075 [20-11075] (CAS) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11075] (Crystal G. Gibson ) [Entered: 11/04/2020 01:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11075] (Shelley Luan Hopkins ) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark D. Hopkins for Fay Servicing, L.L.C. and Wilmington Trust National Association for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11075] (Mark D. Hopkins ) [Entered: 11/04/2020 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:18-CV-3274. Electronic ROA due on 11/17/2020. [20-11075] (CAS) [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9433527-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-11075] (CAS) [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Paul Stafford and Ms. Telea Stafford [20-11075] (LLL) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TELEA JOHNSON STAFFORD AKA TELE STAFFORD is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Fay Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul K Stafford