This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 06:02:49 (UTC).

Paul Clark, Sr. v. Council of Unit Owners

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Paul Clark, Sr filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Council of Unit Owners. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2140

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

REBECCA DELORME

PAUL C. CLARK, SR.

PAUL CLARK, JR.

COUNCIL OF UNIT OWNERS OF THE 100 HARBORVIEW DRIVE CONDOMINIUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Brennan Christopher McCarthy Esq.

Attorney at MCCARTHY PARTNERS, PLLC

1116 West Street

Annapolis, MD 21401

Lisa Yonka Stevens

Attorney at YUMKAS VIDMAR SWEENEY& MULRENIN, LLC

10211 Wincopin Circle

Columbia, MD 21404

James Russell Schraf

Attorney at YUMKAS VIDMAR SWEENEY& MULRENIN, LLC

10211 Wincopin Circle

Columbia, MD 21404

Paul Sweeney

Attorney at YUMKAS VIDMAR SWEENEY& MULRENIN, LLC

10211 Wincopin Circle

Columbia, MD 21404

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2140, 19-2183] MRB [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:49 AM]

#23

(#23) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2181, 19-2140, 19-2183] MRB [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:09 AM]

#22

(#22) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.; REBECCA DELORME; PAUL CLARK, JR. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/24/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 01/23/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 02/24/2020. [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:01 AM]

#21

(#21) Letter re: Correspondence/Line regarding Transcripts by Rebecca Delorme, Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Paul Clark, Jr. in 19-2140 . [1000625613] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/13/2019 05:10 PM]

#20

(#20) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140, 19-2183 regarding the filing of transcript order. Transcript order order due 11/15/2019 by Paul Clark Jr., Paul C. Clark Sr. and Rebecca Delorme. [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:31 AM]

#19

(#19) Appendix designations by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2183 Is statement of issues included? No [19-2140, 19-2183] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:25 PM]

#18

(#18) STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Appellee Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140, Appellant Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2183. [19-2140, 19-2183] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:19 PM]

#17

(#17) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:10 PM]

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000623255] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:13 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER filed rescinding briefing order. Copies to all parties. [1000615159] [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:02 PM]

#3

(#9) ORDER filed consolidating case 19-2183 with 19-2140. Cross-appeal appellant: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.; REBECCA DELORME; PAUL CLARK, JR. Copies to all parties. [1000615161] [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:04 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000612024] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:35 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul Sweeney for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612019] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:33 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa Yonka Stevens for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612016] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:32 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James R. Schraf for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612012] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:30 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Stevens. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/26/2019. Response Brief due 12/26/2019 [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:39 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03542-SAG,16-13049,17-00045. Mailed to: Stevens. [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:37 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03542-SAG,16-13049,17-00045. Mailed to: Stevens. [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:37 PM]

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2140, 19-2183] MRB [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2181, 19-2140, 19-2183] MRB [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.; REBECCA DELORME; PAUL CLARK, JR. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/24/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 01/23/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 02/24/2020. [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Letter re: Correspondence/Line regarding Transcripts by Rebecca Delorme, Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Paul Clark, Jr. in 19-2140 . [1000625613] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/13/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140, 19-2183 regarding the filing of transcript order. Transcript order order due 11/15/2019 by Paul Clark Jr., Paul C. Clark Sr. and Rebecca Delorme. [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Appendix designations by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2183 Is statement of issues included? No [19-2140, 19-2183] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Appellee Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140, Appellant Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2183. [19-2140, 19-2183] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000623255] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brennan C. McCarthy for Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140. [1000623249] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr., Rebecca Delorme and Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140, Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr., Rebecca Delorme and Monique D. Almy in 19-2181, Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium and Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2183 requesting response to court inquiry [1000615424]. Mailed to: Almy. Due: 11/07/2019 [19-2140, 19-2183, 19-2181] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER filed consolidating case 19-2183 with 19-2140. Cross-appeal appellant: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.; REBECCA DELORME; PAUL CLARK, JR. Copies to all parties. [1000615161] [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER filed rescinding briefing order. Copies to all parties. [1000615159] [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000612024] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul Sweeney for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612019] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa Yonka Stevens for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612016] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James R. Schraf for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612012] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Stevens. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/26/2019. Response Brief due 12/26/2019 [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03542-SAG,16-13049,17-00045. Mailed to: Stevens. [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03542-SAG,16-13049,17-00045. Case manager: TFischer. [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less