Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2019 at 06:01:48 (UTC).

Paul Aversano v. Santander Bank NA

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 Paul Aversano filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Santander Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2868

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

SANTANDER BANK NA

Plaintiff / Appellant

PAUL AVERSANO, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Diane A. Bettino Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

136 Main Street, Princeton Forrestal Village, Suite 250

Princeton, NJ 08540

Henry F. Reichner Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Siobhan A. Nolan Esq.

Attorney at Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti

744 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sofia Balile Esq.

Attorney at Lemberg Law

43 Danbury Road, 3Rd Floor

Wilton, CT 06897

Sergei Lemberg Esq.

Attorney at Lemberg & Associates

1100 Summer Street

Stamford, CT 06905

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Santander Bank NA, filed. [19-2868] (HFR) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:27 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Appellee(s) Santander Bank, N.A.. [19-2868] (HFR) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:26 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Paul Aversano, filed. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Paul Aversano, received. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:48 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Paul Aversano advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sergei Lemberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Paul Aversano. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to Sofia Balile, Esq., Diane A. Bettino, Esq., Siobhan A. Nolan, Esq. and Henry F. Reichner, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 08/29/2019. (AWI) [Entered: 08/15/2019 09:35 AM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Court's Standing Order

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

DC Order dated 7/26/19

Open Document #2

DC Memorandum Opinion dated 7/26/19

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Santander Bank NA, filed. [19-2868] (HFR) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Appellee(s) Santander Bank, N.A.. [19-2868] (HFR) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Paul Aversano, filed. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Paul Aversano, received. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Paul Aversano advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sergei Lemberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Paul Aversano. [19-2868] (SL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Sofia Balile, Esq., Diane A. Bettino, Esq., Siobhan A. Nolan, Esq. and Henry F. Reichner, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 08/29/2019. (AWI) [Entered: 08/15/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AWI) [Entered: 08/15/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Paul Aversano in District Court No. 3-17-cv-12694. (AWI) [Entered: 08/15/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTANDER BANK, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sergei Lemberg