This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/20/2023 at 06:46:08 (UTC).

Patricia Young v. Community Health Systems, Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 Patricia Young filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Community Health Systems, Inc,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-14255

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PATRICIA YOUNG

Defendant / Appellees

COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEMS INC

HERNANDO HMA, LLC

JOHN DOES 1-5

CHSPSC, LLC

CHS/COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Barry L. Kramer

Attorney at Law Office of Barry Kramer

9550 S Eastern Ave Ste 253

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Matthew Peterson

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Janet R. Varnell

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Brian W. Warwick

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Erika Roxanne Willis

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joel Russell Mohorter

Attorney at Stoler Russell Keener Verona, PA

201 N Franklin St Ste 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

Mahlon Herbert Barlow

Attorney at Sivyer Barlow & Watson, PA

401 E Jackson St Ste 2225

Tampa, FL 33602

David Clark Borucke

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Daniel Ari Shapiro

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

#1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

1 #2

NOA DE# 86

1 #3

Order DE# 85

1 #4

Order DE# 75

#2

(#2) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Janet R. Varnell for Patricia Young. [22-14255] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:38 PM]

#3

(#3) ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erika Roxanne Willis for Patricia Young. [22-14255]--[Edited 01/09/2023 by OCK] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:40 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erika Roxanne Willis for Patricia Young. [22-14255] (ECF: Erika Willis) [Entered: 01/09/2023 05:22 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III for CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc., CHSPSC, LLC and Community Health Systems Inc. [22-14255] (ECF: Mahlon Barlow) [Entered: 01/10/2023 12:34 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Clark Borucke for Hernando HMA, LLC. [22-14255] (ECF: David Borucke) [Entered: 01/10/2023 01:17 PM]

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14255] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/11/2023 04:40 PM]

#10

(#10) Attorney Janet R. Varnell for Appellant Patricia Young has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 01/17/2023 02:46 PM]

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Clark Borucke for Appellee Hernando HMA, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14255] (ECF: David Borucke) [Entered: 01/20/2023 02:26 PM]

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mahlon Herbert Barlow for Appellees CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc., CHSPSC, LLC and Community Health Systems Inc. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14255] (ECF: Mahlon Barlow) [Entered: 01/24/2023 05:05 PM]

#13

(#13) MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Patricia Young. Motion is Unopposed. [13] [22-14255]--[Edited 01/27/2023 by CB] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/26/2023 04:38 PM]

#15

(#15) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Erika Roxanne Willis for Appellant Patricia Young. [Entered: 01/27/2023 04:38 PM]

#16

(#16) MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/23/2023 filed by Patricia Young. Motion is Unopposed. [16] [22-14255] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 02/17/2023 11:47 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/23/2023 filed by Patricia Young. Motion is Unopposed. [16] [22-14255] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 02/17/2023 11:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Erika Roxanne Willis for Appellant Patricia Young. [Entered: 01/27/2023 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: Appellant's motion for leave to file the civil appeal statement form out of time is GRANTED by clerk [ # 13 ]. [Entered: 01/27/2023 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Patricia Young. Motion is Unopposed. [13] [22-14255]--[Edited 01/27/2023 by CB] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/26/2023 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mahlon Herbert Barlow for Appellees CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc., CHSPSC, LLC and Community Health Systems Inc. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14255] (ECF: Mahlon Barlow) [Entered: 01/24/2023 05:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Clark Borucke for Appellee Hernando HMA, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14255] (ECF: David Borucke) [Entered: 01/20/2023 02:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Attorney Janet R. Varnell for Appellant Patricia Young has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 01/17/2023 02:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14255] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/11/2023 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Clark Borucke for Hernando HMA, LLC. [22-14255] (ECF: David Borucke) [Entered: 01/10/2023 01:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III for CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc., CHSPSC, LLC and Community Health Systems Inc. [22-14255] (ECF: Mahlon Barlow) [Entered: 01/10/2023 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erika Roxanne Willis for Patricia Young. [22-14255] (ECF: Erika Willis) [Entered: 01/09/2023 05:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#5) Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Janet R. Varnell for Erika Roxanne Willis for Patricia Young. Pursuant to FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii) a person cannot electronically file through another person's account. Please resubmit through the appropriate account of the ECF filer reflected on the signature block of the filed document. [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#4) Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellant's brief is due on 03/02/2023, with the appellant's appendix due within seven days of the filing date of the appellant's brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erika Roxanne Willis for Patricia Young. [22-14255]--[Edited 01/09/2023 by OCK] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Janet R. Varnell for Patricia Young. [22-14255] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Patricia Young on 12/21/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/31/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/11/2023 as to Appellant Patricia Young. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/25/2023 as to Appellees Community Health Systems Inc and Hernando HMA, LLC [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less