This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2019 at 06:15:34 (UTC).

Patel v. Beach

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Patel filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Beach. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-949

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Amit Patel

Coxsackie, NY 12051

Defendant / Appellee

George P. Beach, II, Superintendent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Amit Patel

Attorney at Greene Correctional Facility

P.O. Box 975

Coxsackie, NY 12051

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) CERTIFIED AUTHORIZATION FORM, dated 05/30/2019, to Greene Correctional Facility, care of Warden, ISSUED.[2575334] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:50 AM]

#20

(#20) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575300] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:38 AM]

#19

(#19) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, informing Court of proposed due date 06/16/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575281] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:32 AM]

#18

(#18) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575272] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:29 AM]

#17

(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575252] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:23 AM]

#15

(#15) NOTICE, to Appellee George P. Beach, II , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2552793] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:22 PM]

#14

(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM D-P, [10], on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2552784] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:17 PM]

#13

(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [9], on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2552779] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:14 PM]

#12

(#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [8], on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2552769] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:09 PM]

11 #1

PLRA Authorization Form FILED (c)

#7

(#7) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2539064] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:21 PM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2539059] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:19 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2539050] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:15 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2539049] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:14 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CERTIFIED AUTHORIZATION FORM, dated 05/30/2019, to Greene Correctional Facility, care of Warden, ISSUED.[2575334] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, FORM D-P, MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS [ # 17 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED.[2575325] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575300] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, informing Court of proposed due date 06/16/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575281] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575272] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by US mail.[2575252] [19-949] [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE, to Appellee George P. Beach, II , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2552793] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM D-P, [10], on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2552784] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [9], on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2552779] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [8], on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2552769] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT AUTHORIZATION FORM, FILED.[2552763] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • (#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 04/21/2019 by US mail.[2552755] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 04/21/2019 by US mail.[2552754] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • (#8) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. Service date 04/21/2019 by US mail.[2552740] [19-949] [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2539064] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2539059] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2539056] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2539050] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2539049] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Amit Patel, FILED. [2539039] [19-949] [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less