This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/18/2021 at 06:24:14 (UTC).

Parus Holdings Inc. v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Parus Holdings Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1269

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

PARUS HOLDINGS INC.

Appellees

GOOGLE LLC

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

LG ELECTRONICS INC.

LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

John Bruce Campbell

Attorney at McKool Smith

303 Colorado Street

Austin, TX 78701

Appellee Attorney

Elisabeth Hunt

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

Federal Reserve Plaza, 600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/15/2021. [819135] Entry of Appearance is due on 12/30/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/30/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 12/30/2021. Certified List is due on 01/25/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Parus Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant