This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 06:08:50 (UTC).

Parks v. Taylor, et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Parks filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-6014

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LIEUTENANT FNU HENDERSHOT

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

SGT. FNU HANSON

LIEUTENANT FNU CARTER

OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF P.D. TAYLOR

CORPORAL FNU JACKSON

MAJOR FNU HERRON

LIEUTENANT FNU NEAL

FNU STASNETT, Floor Rover

CORPORAL FNU WILSON

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALLEN ALEXANDER PARKS

Norman, OK 73069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carri Ann Remillard

Attorney at Oklahoma County District Attorney

320 Robert S. Kerr Avenue, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

FNU Hendershot

Attorney at Oklahoma County Detention Center

201 North Shartel Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Gary Jay James

Attorney at Gary J. James & Associates, P.C.

P.O. Box 2443

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

Aaron Etherington

Attorney at Oklahoma County District Attorney

320 Robert S. Kerr Avenue, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

Rodney J. Heggy

Attorney at Oklahoma County District Attorney

320 Robert S. Kerr Avenue, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Allen Alexander Parks

Attorney at Cleveland County Detention Center

2550 West Franklin Road

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10819433] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting as modified Appellant's motion to be re-mailed filings the court has produced. The court will re-send the cour'ts 3/8/21 order and the 3/11/21 letter along with an additional set of the opening brief and 1915 forms. The Court construes the reqest for a 60-day suspension of proceedings as a request for an extension of time and grants this as modified. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms are now due on 05/20/2021 for Allen Alexander Parks. See order for additional information. Served on 04/01/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:35 PM]

Open Document

[10818510] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Allen Alexander Parks to be re-mailed filings that this court has produced. Served on 03/29/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:18 AM]

Open Document

[10818508] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Allen Alexander Parks requesting a 60-day suspension of proceedings in this case. Served on 03/29/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:16 AM]

Open Document

[10817501] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gary Jay James for FNU Hendershot. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:49 PM]

Open Document #3

Volume VII - Pleadings (continued)

Open Document #2

Volume VI - Pleadings (continued)

Open Document #1

Volume V - Pleadings (continued)

Open Document #4

Volume IV - Pleadings (continued)

Open Document #3

Volume III - Pleadings (continued)

Open Document #2

Volume II - Pleadings (continued)

Open Document #1

Volume I - Pleadings

Open Document

[10814788] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellee Lt.. Hendershott to file a Notice of appearance or retain counsel by 03/26/2021. Served on 03/12/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/12/2021 01:53 PM]

Open Document

[10814389] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 4/20/21. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 04/01/2021 for Allen Alexander Parks [21-6014] [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:45 AM]

Open Document

[10813071] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the 2/4/21 jurisdiction order [ # 10805307-2 ] and Appellant's response [ # 10811170-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 03/08/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/08/2021 07:45 AM]

Open Document

[10811170] Response filed by Allen Alexander Parks to [ # 10805307-2 ] the 2/4/21 order. Served on 02/18/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:10 PM]

Open Document

[10811155] Entry of appearance filed by Allen Alexander Parks. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-6014] [Entered: 03/01/2021 12:39 PM]

Open Document

[10809571] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion for leave to file an oversized response. Served on 02/22/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:07 PM]

Open Document

[10809499] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Allen Alexander Parks Leave to file an oversized response. Served on 02/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:29 PM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819433] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting as modified Appellant's motion to be re-mailed filings the court has produced. The court will re-send the cour'ts 3/8/21 order and the 3/11/21 letter along with an additional set of the opening brief and 1915 forms. The Court construes the reqest for a 60-day suspension of proceedings as a request for an extension of time and grants this as modified. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms are now due on 05/20/2021 for Allen Alexander Parks. See order for additional information. Served on 04/01/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10818510] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Allen Alexander Parks to be re-mailed filings that this court has produced. Served on 03/29/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10818508] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Allen Alexander Parks requesting a 60-day suspension of proceedings in this case. Served on 03/29/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817501] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gary Jay James for FNU Hendershot. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket[10817475] Entry of appearance submitted by Gary J. James for Appellee FNU Hendershot for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-6014]--[Edited 03/24/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 3/24/21.] GJJ [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10815510] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 7. Volumes V - VII: Pleadings. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/16/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10815504] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 7. Volumes I - IV: Pleadings. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/16/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10814788] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellee Lt.. Hendershott to file a Notice of appearance or retain counsel by 03/26/2021. Served on 03/12/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/12/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10814389] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 4/20/21. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 04/01/2021 for Allen Alexander Parks [21-6014] [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10813071] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the 2/4/21 jurisdiction order [ # 10805307-2 ] and Appellant's response [ # 10811170-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 03/08/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/08/2021 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10811170] Response filed by Allen Alexander Parks to [ # 10805307-2 ] the 2/4/21 order. Served on 02/18/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10811155] Entry of appearance filed by Allen Alexander Parks. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-6014] [Entered: 03/01/2021 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10809571] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion for leave to file an oversized response. Served on 02/22/2021. [21-6014] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10809499] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Allen Alexander Parks Leave to file an oversized response. Served on 02/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014] [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808452] Entry of appearance filed by Rodney J Heggy, Aaron Etherington and Carri Ann Remillard for P.D. Taylor, Keith Jackson, and Tiffany Carter. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: US mail, email [21-6014] [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket[10808444] Entry of appearance submitted by Carri A. Remillard, Aaron Etherington, and Rodney J. Heggy for Appellees FNU Carter, FNU Jackson and P.D. Taylor for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-6014]--[Edited 02/17/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/17/21] CAR [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10805307] Jurisdiction challenged. Response that sets forth any basis for this court's exercise of jurisdiction over this appeal is due on or before 02/25/2021 for Allen Alexander Parks as set forth in the attached order. Briefing on the merits is suspended. [21-6014] [Entered: 02/04/2021 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10805105] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/03/2021. Fee or 1915 forms due in district court 03/05/2021 for Allen Alexander Parks. Notice of appearance due on 02/17/2021 for FNU Carter, FNU Hendershot, FNU Jackson and P.D. Taylor. Notice of appearance due on 03/05/2021 for Allen Alexander Parks. [21-6014] [Entered: 02/03/2021 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less