This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:27 (UTC).

Parker-El v. City of New York

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Parker-El filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2160

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Dwayne Parker-El

Bronx, NY 10451

Defendant / Appellees

Denise Mabry, Probation Officer

Lawrence Arato, Probation Officer

Laverne Ebron, Supervising Probation Officer

Maritza Hernandez, Probation Officer

Jeffrey Pruzan, Assistant District Attorney

Rosa Perez, Probation Officer

City of New York

Douglas LaMotta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dwayne Parker-El

P.O. Box 1522

Bronx, NY 10451

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Zachary W. Carter

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2611369] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:08 AM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2611379] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:12 AM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Dwayne Parker-El, FILED. No Service.[2649366] [19-2160] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:12 PM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#11

(#11) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Parker-El, FILED. No Service.[2649374] [19-2160] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:15 PM]

#6

(#6) LETTER, dated 07/19/2019, on behalf of Appellee Lawrence Arato, City of New York, Laverne Ebron, Maritza Hernandez, Douglas LaMotta, Denise Mabry, Rosa Perez and Jeffrey Pruzan, requesting to be removed as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 07/19/2019 by email.[2613395] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/22/2019 08:49 AM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2611372] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:10 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#10

(#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Parker-El, FILED. No Service.[2649369] [19-2160] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:14 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Parker-El, FILED. No Service.[2649374] [19-2160] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Parker-El, FILED. No Service.[2649369] [19-2160] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Dwayne Parker-El, FILED. No Service.[2649366] [19-2160] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#7) ATTORNEY, Zachary W. Carter, for Appellee Lawrence Arato, City of New York, Laverne Ebron, Maritza Hernandez, Douglas LaMotta, Denise Mabry, Rosa Perez and Jeffrey Pruzan, TERMINATED.[2613396] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/22/2019 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER, dated 07/19/2019, on behalf of Appellee Lawrence Arato, City of New York, Laverne Ebron, Maritza Hernandez, Douglas LaMotta, Denise Mabry, Rosa Perez and Jeffrey Pruzan, requesting to be removed as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 07/19/2019 by email.[2613395] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/22/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2611379] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2611374] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2611372] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2611369] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Parker-El, FILED. [2611366] [19-2160] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.