This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 06:04:00 (UTC).

Parish of Cameron, et al v. Auster Oil & Gas, Incorporated, et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Parish of Cameron filed an Other lawsuit against Auster Oil Gas, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30829

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor / Appellees

STATE OF LOUISIANA, EX REL, JEFF LANDRY

STATE OF LOUISIANA, on behalf of Louisiana Department of Natural Resources, on behalf of Office of Coastal Management, on behalf of Thomas F. Harris

Defendant / Appellants

CHEVRON USA HOLDINGS, INCORPORATED

SHELL OFFSHORE, INCORPORATED

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

CHEVRON PIPE LINE COMPANY

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

TEXAS COMPANY

CHEVRON USA, INCORPORATED

SHELL OIL COMPANY

SWEPI, L.P.

KERR-MCGEE OIL & GAS ONSHORE, L.P.

Plaintiff / Appellee

PARISH OF CAMERON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Beauregard Jones

Attorney at Louisiana Deptartment of Justice

1885 N. 3Rd Street, Livingston Building

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

James B. Canfield

Attorney at Department of Revenue & Taxation

617 N. 3Rd Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-0000

Donald Wayne Price

Attorney at Department of Natural Resources

P.O. Box 94396

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9396

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Rocco F. Magni

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Peter D. Keisler Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin, L.L.P.

1501 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Alexandra Giselle White

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Ryan C. Morris

Attorney at Sidley Austin, L.L.P.

1501 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Michael Raudon Phillips Esq.

Attorney at Kean Miller, L.L.P.

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Eric Julian Mayer

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Jennifer Jo Clark

Attorney at Sidley Austin, L.L.P.

1501 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

David Charles Frederick

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Sumner Square

Washington, DC 20036

Kelly Brechtel Becker Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

Brendan Jeremiah Crimmins

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Sumner Square

Washington, DC 20036

Russell Keith Jarrett Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

George Arceneaux Esq. III

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

822 Harding Street

Lafayette, LA 70503-2320

Nancy Gordon Milburn

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P.

250 W. 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Martin A. Stern

Attorney at Adams & Reese, L.L.P.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

Robert Beattie McNeal Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Chad Ellis Mudd

Attorney at Mudd & Bruchhaus, L.L.C.

410 E. College Street

Lake Charles, LA 70605-0000

Donald T. Carmouche

Attorney at Talbot, Carmouche & Marcello

17405 Perkins Road

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Parish of Cameron, Mr. Jeff Landry and State of Louisiana [9196437-1] to the Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., Chevron USA, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company, BP America Production Company, Texas Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company and Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated in 19-30829 [ # 9189387-2 ] [19-30829] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Parish of Cameron [9196437-1] to the Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Texas Company, BP America Production Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated and Shell Oil Company [ # 9189387-2 ] Date of Service: 11/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arceneaux, Becker, Clark, Crimmins, Frederick, Heartney, Jarrett, Keisler, Kuchler, Magni, Mayer, McNeal, Milburn, Morris, Phillips, Stern, White; Attorney for Appellees: Canfield, Carmouche, Jones, Marcello, Price, Seidemann; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Mudd. [19-30829] (Victor L. Marcello ) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:06 PM]

Open Document

COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response from the appellees to the Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., Chevron USA, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company, BP America Production Company, Texas Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company and Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated in 19-30829 [ # 9189387-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 11/22/2019. [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 11/18/2019 12:09 PM]

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Deidre D. Juranka. [19-30829] (Deidre D. Juranka ) [Entered: 11/05/2019 02:06 PM]

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #2

Attachment to Form for Appearance

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kelly Brechtel Becker, Esq. for Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and SWEPI, L.P. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30829] (Kelly Brechtel Becker ) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:54 AM]

Open Document

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to stay order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana dated 9/26/19 [ # 9162219-2 ] filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and Texas Company Date of Service: 10/07/2019 [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 01:58 PM]

Open Document

OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Chevron USA, Incorporated, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Texas Company, BP America Production Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated and Shell Oil Company to stay order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana dated 09/26/2019 [9162219-2]. Response/Opposition due on 10/17/2019. [19-30829] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Chevron USA, Incorporated, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron Pipe Line Company and Texas Company to stay order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana dated 09/26/2019 [9162219-2]. Date of service: 10/07/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arceneaux, Becker, Keisler, McNeal, White; Attorney for Appellees: Canfield, Carmouche, Jones, Mudd [19-30829] (Peter D. Keisler ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:54 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Peter D. Keisler, Esq. for Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated and Texas Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30829] (Peter D. Keisler ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:14 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and Texas Company [19-30829] (CCR) [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:17 PM]

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/06/2020 for Appellants BP America Production Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and Texas Company. [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 11/27/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER that the appellants' opposed motion for injunction pending appeal is GRANTED [ # 9189387-2 ]. [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 11/26/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY filed by Appellants Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated and Texas Company [9197732-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees Parish of Cameron, Mr. Jeff Landry and State of Louisiana [ # 9196437-2 ], to the Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Texas Company, BP America Production Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated and Shell Oil Company [ # 9189387-2 ]. Date of Service: 11/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arceneaux, Becker, Clark, Crimmins, Frederick, Heartney, Jarrett, Keisler, Kuchler, Magni, Mayer, McNeal, Milburn, Morris, Phillips, Stern, White; Attorney for Appellees: Canfield, Carmouche, Jones, Marcello, Mudd, Price, Seidemann. [19-30829] (Peter D. Keisler ) [Entered: 11/25/2019 09:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Parish of Cameron, Mr. Jeff Landry and State of Louisiana [9196437-1] to the Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., Chevron USA, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company, BP America Production Company, Texas Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company and Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated in 19-30829 [ # 9189387-2 ] [19-30829] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Parish of Cameron [9196437-1] to the Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Texas Company, BP America Production Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated and Shell Oil Company [ # 9189387-2 ] Date of Service: 11/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arceneaux, Becker, Clark, Crimmins, Frederick, Heartney, Jarrett, Keisler, Kuchler, Magni, Mayer, McNeal, Milburn, Morris, Phillips, Stern, White; Attorney for Appellees: Canfield, Carmouche, Jones, Marcello, Price, Seidemann; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Mudd. [19-30829] (Victor L. Marcello ) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30829] (MRW) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response from the appellees to the Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P., Chevron USA, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company, BP America Production Company, Texas Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company and Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated in 19-30829 [ # 9189387-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 11/22/2019. [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 11/18/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Attorney Donald W. Price added as counsel of record for Appellee State of Louisiana in 19-30829 [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 11/18/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Attorney Ryan Michael Seidemann added as counsel of record for Appellee Jeff Landry in 19-30829 [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 11/18/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company, SWEPI, L.P., Texas Company, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, L.P. for injunction pending appeal [9189387-2]. Response/Opposition due on 11/25/2019. [19-30829] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated and Texas Company for injunction pending appeal [9189387-2]. Date of service: 11/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arceneaux, Becker, Clark, Crimmins, Frederick, Heartney, Jarrett, Keisler, Kuchler, Magni, Mayer, McNeal, Milburn, Morris, Phillips, Stern, White; Attorney for Appellees: Canfield, Carmouche, Jones, Marcello; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Mudd [19-30829] (Peter D. Keisler ) [Entered: 11/13/2019 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Deidre D. Juranka. [19-30829] (Deidre D. Juranka ) [Entered: 11/05/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kelly Brechtel Becker, Esq. for Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and SWEPI, L.P. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30829] (Kelly Brechtel Becker ) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Peter D. Keisler for Appellant Texas Company in 19-30829, Attorney Peter D. Keisler for Appellant Chevron USA, Incorporated in 19-30829, Attorney Peter D. Keisler for Appellant Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated in 19-30829, Attorney Peter D. Keisler for Appellant Chevron Pipe Line Company in 19-30829 [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9162326-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 10/23/2019 for Appellants BP America Production Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and Texas Company [19-30829] (CCR) [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to stay order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana dated 9/26/19 [ # 9162219-2 ] filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and Texas Company Date of Service: 10/07/2019 [19-30829] (MCS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Chevron USA, Incorporated, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Texas Company, BP America Production Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated and Shell Oil Company to stay order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana dated 09/26/2019 [9162219-2]. Response/Opposition due on 10/17/2019. [19-30829] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Chevron USA, Incorporated, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron Pipe Line Company and Texas Company to stay order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana dated 09/26/2019 [9162219-2]. Date of service: 10/07/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arceneaux, Becker, Keisler, McNeal, White; Attorney for Appellees: Canfield, Carmouche, Jones, Mudd [19-30829] (Peter D. Keisler ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30829] (Ryan C. Morris ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30829] (Jennifer Jo Clark ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Peter D. Keisler, Esq. for Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated and Texas Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30829] (Peter D. Keisler ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Attorney Peter Keisler added as counsel of record for Appellants Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated and Texas Company in 19-30829 [19-30829] (AGL) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, Chevron Pipe Line Company, Chevron USA Holdings, Incorporated, Chevron USA, Incorporated, Exxon Mobil Corporation, SWEPI, L.P., Shell Offshore, Incorporated, Shell Oil Company and Texas Company [19-30829] (CCR) [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Parish of Cameron is a litigant

Latest cases where SWEPI LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Shell Offshore, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP is a litigant