This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/10/2021 at 06:28:45 (UTC).

Parchmann v. Metlife, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Parchmann filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Metlife, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-291

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Parchmann

Defendant / Appellees

John C. R. Hele

Metlife, Inc.

William J. Wheeler

Steven A. Kandarian

Plaintiff / Appellant

KBC Asset Management NV

Petitioner / Appellant

Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Maeve O'Connor Esq.

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Elliot Greenfield Esq.

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Plaintiff / Appellant and Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher F. Moriarty Esq.

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard, P.O. Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Douglas S. Wilens

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

120 East Palmetto Park Road

Boca Raton, FL 33432

David Avi Rosenfeld Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

58 South Service Road

Melville, NY 11747

Gregg S. Levin Esq.

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard, P.O. Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Michael Gerard Capeci Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

5 Walden Place

Huntington, NY 11743

Erin Williams Esq.

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard, P.O. Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

 

Court Documents

#48

#46

#41

#39

#38

#36

#34

#33

#32

#28

#26

#25

#23

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ATTORNEY, Erin Williams for Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada KBC Asset Management NV, in case 21-291 , [ # 48 ], ADDED.[3065598] [21-291] [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by CM/ECF. [3065579] [21-291] [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to remove appeal from the expedited calendar and setting new briefing schedule[ # 36 ] filed by Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, by JON, FILED. [3054846][46] [21-291] [Entered: 03/12/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 39 ], on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 03/09/2021 by CM/ECF.[3052474][41] [21-291] [Entered: 03/09/2021 06:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 36 ], on behalf of Appellee Metlife, Inc., Steven A. Kandarian, John C. R. Hele and William J. Wheeler, FILED. Service date 03/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3050559] [21-291] [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Metlife, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3050549] [21-291] [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION, to remove case from the expedited calendar, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3050282] [21-291]--[Edited 03/08/2021 by JW] [Entered: 03/05/2021 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY, Gregg S. Levin for Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada KBC Asset Management NV, in case 21-291 , [ # 34 ], ADDED.[3049878] [21-291] [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3049686] [21-291] [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' brief due date as 04/06/2021, appellees' brief due date as 05/11/2021, TRANSMITTED.[3047509] [21-291] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 02/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3042192] [21-291] [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 02/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3042110] [21-291] [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3041543] [21-291] [Entered: 02/22/2021 08:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [9], on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED.[3041142] [21-291] [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3040651] [21-291] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3036035] [21-291] [Entered: 02/12/2021 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14118966, FILED.[3036033] [21-291] [Entered: 02/12/2021 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/12/2021, RECEIVED.[3036031] [21-291] [Entered: 02/12/2021 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/11/2021, RECEIVED.[3036028] [21-291] [Entered: 02/12/2021 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant KBC Asset Management NV and Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada, FILED. [3036021] [21-291] [Entered: 02/12/2021 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada is a litigant

Latest cases where KBC Asset Management N.V. is a litigant

Latest cases where METLIFE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Scott Wilens