This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/07/2020 at 06:06:20 (UTC).

Parallel Networks Licensing v. Microsoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 Parallel Networks Licensing filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1669

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

MICROSOFT CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

PARALLEL NETWORKS LICENSING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jason W. Wolff

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

12390 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Juanita Rose Brooks

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

12390 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Adam Wyatt Poff

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

1000 North King Street, Rodney Square

Wilmington, DE 19801

James Elroy Quigley

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 W 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Christopher Thor Bovenkamp

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

John Bruce Campbell

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 W 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Leah Buratti

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 W 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Microsoft Corporation. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689185] [20-1669] [Nitika Gupta Fiorella] [Entered: 04/22/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Microsoft Corporation. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689184] [20-1669] [Nitika Gupta Fiorella] [Entered: 04/22/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Jason W. Wolff as of counsel for Appellee Microsoft Corporation. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689183] [20-1669] [Nitika Gupta Fiorella] [Entered: 04/22/2020 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Juanita R. Brooks as of counsel for Appellee Microsoft Corporation. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689180] [20-1669] [Nitika Gupta Fiorella] [Entered: 04/22/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Nitika Gupta Fiorella as principal counsel for Appellee Microsoft Corporation. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689179] [20-1669] [Nitika Gupta Fiorella] [Entered: 04/22/2020 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for James E. Quigley as of counsel for Appellant Parallel Networks Licensing, LLC. Service: 04/15/2020 by email. [687297] [20-1669] [James Quigley] [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Parallel Networks Licensing, LLC. Service: 04/15/2020 by email. [687293] [20-1669] [Leah Buratti] [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Parallel Networks Licensing, LLC. Service: 04/15/2020 by email. [687291] [20-1669] [Leah Buratti] [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Leah Buratti as of counsel for Appellant Parallel Networks Licensing, LLC. Service: 04/15/2020 by email. [687287] [20-1669] [Leah Buratti] [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for John B. Campbell as of counsel for Appellant Parallel Networks Licensing, LLC. Service: 04/15/2020 by email. [687284] [20-1669] [John Campbell] [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Christopher Bovenkamp as principal counsel for Appellant Parallel Networks Licensing, LLC. Service: 04/15/2020 by email. [687283] [20-1669] [Christopher Bovenkamp] [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/02/2020. [685306] Entry of Appearance is due 04/22/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/22/2020. Docketing Statement is due 04/22/2020. Appellant's brief is due 06/08/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 04/08/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Parallel Networks Licensing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leah Buratti

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher T. Bovenkamp