This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/06/2020 at 06:09:45 (UTC).

Paradise Unified School Distri, et al v. Fire Victim Trust, et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Paradise Unified School Distri, filed an Other lawsuit against Fire Victim Trust,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1170

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

COMCAST

ADVENTIST HEALTH

PARADISE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

NAPA COUNTY RECYCLING & WASTE SERVICES, LLC/NAPA RECYCLING & WASTE SERVICES, LLC

NORTHERN RECYCLING AND WASTE SERVICES, LLC/NORTHERN HOLDINGS, LLC

Debtors

In re: PG&E CORPORATION

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Appellees

FIRE VICTIM TRUST

REORGANIZED DEBTORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Lauren R. Lifland Esquire

Robin D. Ball

Rebecca J. Winthrop

Peter Salvador Munoz

Appellee Attorneys

David Molton

Joel S. Miliband Esquire

Jessica Liou

Theodore E. Tsekerides

Peter J. Benvenutti Esquire

Ray C. Schrock

Stephen Karotkin

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Notice of Referral

1 #3

Transmittal

#2

3 #1

District Court Notice Sent

3 #2

Objection of BAP

#3

Noitce of Appeal

3 #4

Notice of Referral

3 #5

Transmittal

3 #6

Docket Report

 

Docket Entries

08/04/2020

Docket(#4) CLOSED: Case closed: Election without judicial action; 08/04/2020; 20-1170; Transferred by election. (CLS) [Entered: 08/04/2020 12:32 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice sent 08/04/2020 to District Court transferring appeal per objection. (CLS) [Entered: 08/04/2020 12:29 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Attorney Joel S. Miliband, Esquire for Appellee Fire Victim Trust's Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 07/31/2020 US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Ball, Winthrop; Attorney for Appellees: Karotkin, Liou, Schrock, Tsekerides; email - Attorney for Appellees: Benvenutti, Miliband, Molton; Attorney for Appellants: Lifland, Munoz. [20-1170] (JSM) [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:55 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 07/02/2020, notice of referral, transmittal form. (CLS) [Entered: 07/08/2020 04:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less