This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2021 at 06:05:52 (UTC).

Pandora Distribution, LLC v. Ottawa OH, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Pandora Distribution, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ottawa OH, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3158

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

PANDORA DISTRIBUTION, LLC

Defendant / Appellant

OTTAWA OH, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

GENESEE & WYOMING, INC.

PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, nka Philips North America LLC

DBI PARTNERS, LLC

777 N. Rainbow Boulevard

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Timothy P. Nackowicz

Attorney at Law Office

118 E. Third Street, Suite A

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Timothy John Fitzgerald

Attorney at Koehler Fitzgerald

1111 Superior Avenue, E., Suite 2500

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James R. Carnes

Attorney at Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick

1000 Jackson Street

Toledo, OH 43604-5573

William A. Doyle

Attorney at Taft, Stettinius & Hollister

200 Public Square, Suite 3500

Cleveland, OH 44114

Bruce J.L. Lowe

Attorney at Taft, Stettinius & Hollister

200 Public Square, Suite 3500

Cleveland, OH 44114

DBI Partners, LLC

777 N. Rainbow Boulevard

Las Vegas, NV 89107

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) STATUS REPORTS filed. The next Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/23/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa, OH, LLC, Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2021 08:15 AM]

#21

(#21) NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Pandora Distribution, LLC regarding Non-involvement of Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. in Case No. 21-3158.. Certificate of Service: 03/17/2021. [21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:24 AM]

#18

(#18) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC.. Certificate of Service: 03/08/2021. [21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:28 AM]

#30

(#23) STATUS REPORT filed. The next Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/09/2021 from Counsel for Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:57 PM]

#29

(#22) STATUS REPORT filed. The next Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/09/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa OH, LLC. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:53 PM]

#28

(#20) A Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 03/19/2021 from Counsel for Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:39 PM]

#27

(#19) A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 03/19/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa OH, LLC. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:34 PM]

#24

(#17) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158, 21-3127 by Bruce J.L. Lowe. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (BJL) [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:14 PM]

#23

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William A. Doyle for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158, 21-3127 Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (WAD) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:53 PM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:51 PM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy John Fitzgerald for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ottawa OH, LLC Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3158] (TJF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:51 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ottawa OH, LLC by Timothy J. Fitzgerald. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3158] (TJF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:50 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 5 ], filed by Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 02/26/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158] (CAM) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:43 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:23 AM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORTS filed. The next Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/23/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa, OH, LLC, Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2021 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STATUS REPORT filed. The next Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/09/2021 from Counsel for Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATUS REPORT filed. The next Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/09/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa OH, LLC. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Pandora Distribution, LLC regarding Non-involvement of Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. in Case No. 21-3158.. Certificate of Service: 03/17/2021. [21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) A Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 03/19/2021 from Counsel for Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 03/19/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa OH, LLC. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC.. Certificate of Service: 03/08/2021. [21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158, 21-3127 by Bruce J.L. Lowe. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (BJL) [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William A. Doyle for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158, 21-3127 Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (WAD) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158 by William A. Doyle. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (WAD) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy John Fitzgerald for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ottawa OH, LLC Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3158] (TJF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ottawa OH, LLC by Timothy J. Fitzgerald. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3158] (TJF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE LISTING BOTH CASE NOS. 21-3127 AND 21-3158***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 5 ], filed by Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 02/26/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158] (CAM) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE LISTING BOTH CASE NOS. 21-3127 AND 21-3158 AND CORRECT THE DEFICIENCIES NOTED IN RE 13***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 by Timothy P. Nackowicz. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE ONLY IN CASE 21-3127 WHERE FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO IS PARTY ON APPEAL. COUNSEL MUST UNCHECK THE OTHER CASE NUMBERS***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company in 21-3127 by David Sporar. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (DS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE ONLY IN CASE 21-3127 WHERE FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO IS PARTY ON APPEAL. COUNSEL MUST UNCHECK THE OTHER CASE NUMBERS***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher F. Swing for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company in 21-3127 Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (CFS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENESEE & WYOMING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William A. Doyle