This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2021 at 06:52:39 (UTC).

Pamela Green v. American Modern Home Ins. Co.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 Pamela Green filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Modern Home Ins Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-3786

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Pamela Green

Defendant / Appellant

American Modern Home Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Stevan E. Vowell

Attorney at TAYLOR LAW PARTNERS

303 E. Millsap, P.O. Box 8310

Fayetteville, AR 72703

W. H. Taylor

Attorney at TAYLOR LAW PARTNERS

303 E. Millsap, P.O. Box 8310

Fayetteville, AR 72703

Kenneth P. Castleberry

Attorney at MURPHY & THOMPSON

Suite 200, 555 E. Main Street

Batesville, AR 72503-0000

Donald Mattson Keil

Attorney at KEIL & GOODSON

406 Walnut Street

Texarkana, AR 71854

Richard Eugene Norman

Attorney at CROWLEY & NORMAN

Suite 1775, Three Riverway

Houston, TX 77056

Tanner W. Hicks

Attorney at MATTINGLY & ROSELIUS

210 W. Oklahoma Avenue

Guthrie, OK 70344

Ronald M. Weber Jr.

Attorney at CROWLEY & NORMAN

Suite 1775, Three Riverway

Houston, TX 77056

Timothy J. Myers

Attorney at TAYLOR LAW PARTNERS

303 E. Millsap, P.O. Box 8310

Fayetteville, AR 72703

Richard A. Russo Jr.

Attorney at KESSLER & TOPAZ

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087-0000

Matthew Leo Mustokoff

Attorney at KESSLER & TOPAZ

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087-0000

Jack A. Mattingly Jr.

Attorney at MATTINGLY & ROSELIUS

210 W. Oklahoma Avenue

Guthrie, OK 70344

George Louis McWilliams

406 Walnut

Texarkana, AR 71854

John Clinton Goodson

Attorney at KEIL & GOODSON

406 Walnut Street

Texarkana, AR 71854

James Marvin Pratt Jr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES M. PRATT, JR.

144 Washington Street, N.W., P.O. Box 938

Camden, AR 71701-0938

William B. Putman

Attorney at PUTMAN LAW OFFICE

Suite 101, 3900 N. Front Street

Fayetteville, AR 72703

Jason Ernest Roselius

Attorney at ROSELIUS & MATTINGLY

13190 N. Macarthur Boulevard

Oklahoma, OK 73142

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert James Tucker

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER

Suite 1200, 200 Civic Center Drive

Columbus, OH 43215-0000

Andrew Evan Samuels

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER

Suite 1200, 200 Civic Center Drive

Columbus, OH 43215-0000

Rodger L. Eckelberry

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER

Suite 1200, 200 Civic Center Drive

Columbus, OH 43215-0000

Mark Alan Johnson

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER

Suite 1200, 200 Civic Center Drive

Columbus, OH 43215-0000

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [4554643] [16-3786] (AMT) [Entered: 07/07/2017 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - Granting [ # 4553808-2 ] joint motion to dismiss case filed by Mr. George Louis McWilliams, Mr. Richard Eugene Norman, Mr. Alfred F. Thompson, III, Mr. John Clinton Goodson, Mr. Kenneth P. Castleberry, Mr. Mark Alan Johnson, Mr. Rodger L. Eckelberry, Mr. Donald Mattson Keil, Mr. Ronald M. Weber, Jr., Mr. Richard A. Russo, Jr., Mr. Matthew Leo Mustokoff, Mr. Andrew Evan Samuels, Mr. Robert James Tucker and Mr. W. Kelvin Wyrick, Sr.., The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith.. [4554640] [16-3786] (AMT) [Entered: 07/07/2017 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case, filed by Mr. Rodger L. Eckelberry for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company, Mr. Mark Alan Johnson for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company, Mr. Andrew Evan Samuels for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company, Mr. Robert James Tucker for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company, Mr. W. Kelvin Wyrick, Sr. for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company and Mr. John Clinton Goodson for Appellee Pamela Green, Mr. Donald Mattson Keil for Appellee Pamela Green, Mr. Matthew Leo Mustokoff for Appellee Pamela Green, Mr. Richard A. Russo, Jr. for Appellee Pamela Green, Mr. Kenneth P. Castleberry for Appellee Pamela Green, Mr. George Louis McWilliams for Appellee Pamela Green, Mr. Richard Eugene Norman for Appellee Pamela Green, Mr. Alfred F. Thompson, III for Appellee Pamela Green and Mr. Ronald M. Weber, Jr. for Appellee Pamela Green w/service 07/05/2017. [4553808] [16-3786] (MAJ) [Entered: 07/05/2017 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company regarding Joint Notice of Settlement. w/service 12/22/2016 [4482711] [16-3786] (RJT) [Entered: 12/22/2016 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketUPDATED fee status - [Case Number 16-3786: paid - cs] (per notice from Dist Ct - fee paid 10/7/16) [4457776] [16-3786] (EDG) [Entered: 10/12/2016 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kenneth P. (Casey) Castleberry for Appellee Pamela Green w/service 10/03/2016 [4454730] [16-3786] (KPC) [Entered: 10/03/2016 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Richard A. Russo, Jr. for Appellee Pamela Green w/service 10/03/2016 [4454462] [16-3786] (RAR) [Entered: 10/03/2016 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Matthew L. Mustokoff for Appellee Pamela Green w/service 10/03/2016 [4454455] [16-3786] (MLM) [Entered: 10/03/2016 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Andrew E. Samuels for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company w/service 10/03/2016 [4454369] [16-3786] (AES) [Entered: 10/03/2016 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Robert J. Tucker for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company w/service 09/30/2016 [4454054] [16-3786] (RJT) [Entered: 09/30/2016 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Rodger L. Eckelberry for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company w/service 09/30/2016 [4453891] [16-3786] (RLE) [Entered: 09/30/2016 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Mark A. Johnson for Appellant American Modern Home Insurance Company w/service 09/30/2016 [4453888] [16-3786] (MAJ) [Entered: 09/30/2016 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER: On the court's own motion, this matter, case 16-3786, will be held in abeyance pending the Court's dispostion of LaBrier v. State Farm , Nos. 16-3185 and 16-3562. Adp Oct 2016 [4453640] [16-3786] (EDG) [Entered: 09/29/2016 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4453606] [16-3786] (EDG) [Entered: 09/29/2016 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Docketed On Transfer - 23(f) - This case was transferred from miscellaneous case number 16-8016. [4453595] [16-3786] (EDG) [Entered: 09/29/2016 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Modern Home Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert James Tucker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew E Samuels