This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:11:13 (UTC).

Pamela Cauthen v. Andrew Saul, Commissioner

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Pamela Cauthen filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul, Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-60390

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ANDREW M. SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff / Appellant

PAMELA K. CAUTHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stuart Sheffield Davis

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

900 Jefferson Avenue

Oxford, MS 38655

Keith Allen Garner Esq.

Attorney at Social Security Administration

1301 Young Street, Mailroom 104

Dallas, TX 75202-5433

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Leanna Reynolds

Attorney at Thomas U. Reynolds Law Firm

5 S. Court Square, P.O. Drawer 280

Charleston, MS 38921-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

RE-5 Electronic Filers Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Restricted Document #2

QCBR-5 E-Filers Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient for the following reasons: Notice of Appeal is required. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 07/21/2020 for Appellant Pamela K. Cauthen [20-60390] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Pamela K. Cauthen. Date of service: 07/05/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Garner; Attorney for Appellant: Reynolds [20-60390] (Leanna Reynolds ) [Entered: 07/05/2020 09:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Brief NOT Sufficient for the following reasons: statement of the issues must be double spaced; use of "id." not permitted when citing to the record. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 07/21/2020 for Appellant Pamela K. Cauthen.. Appellee's Brief due on 08/05/2020 for Appellee Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security [20-60390] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Pamela K. Cauthen. Date of service: 07/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Garner; Attorney for Appellant: Reynolds [20-60390] (Leanna Reynolds ) [Entered: 07/05/2020 08:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Leanna Reynolds for Appellant Pamela K. Cauthen in 20-60390 [20-60390] (AGL) [Entered: 06/15/2020 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60390] (Leanna Reynolds ) [Entered: 06/13/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/06/2020 for Appellant Pamela K. Cauthen. [20-60390] (DDL) [Entered: 05/27/2020 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-60390] (DDL) [Entered: 05/27/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Stuart Sheffield Davis for Appellee Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security in 20-60390 [20-60390] (CB) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Keith Allen Garner for party(s) Appellee Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, in case 20-60390 [20-60390] (CB) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-60390] (Stuart Sheffield Davis ) [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60390] (Keith Allen Garner ) [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:19-CV-14. Electronic ROA due on 06/05/2020. [20-60390] (MAS) [Entered: 05/21/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9317969-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-60390] (MAS) [Entered: 05/21/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9313414-2] NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Pamela K. Cauthen. [9313414-1] [20-60390] (MAS) [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Pamela K. Cauthen [20-60390] (MAS) [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leanna Reynolds