This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:06:12 (UTC).

Pamela Braswell v. Secretary, Department of Corr.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Pamela Braswell filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12721

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

PAMELA BRASWELL

Quincy, FL 32351

Respondent / Appellee

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Pamela Braswell

Attorney at Gadsden CF - Inmate Legal Mail

6044 Greensboro Hwy

Quincy, FL 32351

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

110 Se 6Th St Fl 10

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Marc Hernandez

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1515 N Flagler Dr Ste 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

USDC Order on IFP

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

District Court Order, DE # 9

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Pamela Braswell. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/15/2019 12:32 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marc B. Hernandez for Secretary, Department of Corrections [19-12721] (ECF: Marc Hernandez) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:23 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marc Hernandez for Appellee Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12721] (ECF: Marc Hernandez) [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:36 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Pamela Braswell. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:04 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Pamela Braswell. [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:54 PM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Pamela Braswell was filed on 05/24/2019. Docket Entry 9. [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:06 AM]

Open Document #1

HAB-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

DIS-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. BBM, RSR and KCN [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Pamela Braswell was filed on 08/19/2019. Docket Entry 13. [Entered: 08/20/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Pamela Braswell. [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Pamela Braswell. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/15/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marc Hernandez for Appellee Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12721] (ECF: Marc Hernandez) [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marc B. Hernandez for Secretary, Department of Corrections [19-12721] (ECF: Marc Hernandez) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Pamela Braswell. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Pamela Braswell was filed on 05/24/2019. Docket Entry 9. [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Pamela Braswell on 07/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.