This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/01/2020 at 06:12:00 (UTC).

PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fu, et al v. BT Group PLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fu, filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against BT Group PLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2106

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NICK ROSE

GAVIN E. PATTERSON

RICHARD CAMERON

LUIS ALVAREZ

BT GROUP PLC

IAN LIVINGSTON

TONY CHANMUGAM

Plaintiff / Appellants

CLAYTON HOLLISTER

PAMCAH-AU LOCAL 675 PENSION FUND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John D. Tortorella Esq.

Attorney at Marino, Tortorella & Boyle

437 Southern Boulevard

Chatham, NJ 07928

Kevin H. Marino Esq.

Attorney at Marino, Tortorella & Boyle

437 Southern Boulevard

Chatham, NJ 07928

Brian S. Weinstein Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

James P. Rouhandeh Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Mari Byrne Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Corey Holzer Esq.

Attorney at Holzer & Holzer

1200 Ashwood Parkway, Suite 410

Atlanta, GA 30338

James E. Cecchi Esq.

Attorney at Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Samuel H. Rudman Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Donald A. Ecklund Esq.

Attorney at Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

David A. Rosenfeld Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Alan I. Ellman Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Marshall P. Dees Esq.

Attorney at Holzer & Holzer

1200 Ashwood Parkway, Suite 410

Atlanta, GA 30338

Douglas S. Wilens Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Opinion 04/24/20

1 #3

District Court Order 04/24/20

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • Docket(#14) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 06/17/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Clayton Hollister and PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Clayton Hollister. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund and Clayton Hollister. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Clayton Hollister and PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Douglas Wilens on behalf of Appellant(s) PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund and Clayton Hollister. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee BT Group PLC. [20-2106] (JDT) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Tortorella on behalf of Appellee(s) BT Group plc; Ian Livingston; Gavin E. Patterson; Tony Chanmugam; Nick Rose; Luis Alvarez; Richard Cameron. [20-2106] (JDT) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin H. Marino on behalf of Appellee(s) BT Group plc; Ian Livingston; Gavin E. Patterson; Tony Chanmugam; Nick Rose; Luis Alvarez; Richard Cameron. [20-2106] (KHM) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MARI BYRNE on behalf of Appellee(s) BT GROUP PLC; IAN LIVINGSTON; GAVIN E. PATTERSON; TONY CHANMUGAM; NICK ROSE; LUIS ALVAREZ; RICHARD CAMERON. [20-2106] (MB) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from JAMES P. ROUHANDEH on behalf of Appellee(s) BT GROUP PLC; IAN LIVINGSTON; GAVIN E. PATTERSON; TONY CHANMUGAM; NICK ROSE; LUIS ALVAREZ; RICHARD CAMERON. [20-2106] (JPR) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Clayton Hollister in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00497. (CJG) [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BT Group PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Scott Wilens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Ian Ellman