This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/14/2021 at 06:05:35 (UTC).

Lee v. Anthony Lawrence Collection

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Lee filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Anthony Lawrence Collection. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-30796

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Anthony Lawrence Collection, L.L.C.

Thaddeus Reed, also known as Reed Enterprise

Defron Fobb

Collegiate Licensing Company, L.L.C., incorrectly sued as Learfield Communications, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellants

Business Moves Consulting, Incorporated

Paige Lee

Curtis Bordenave

Brandmixer, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kenneth L. Tolar

Attorney at Tolar Harrigan & Morris, L.L.C.

1055 Saint Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70130

Patrick Dominic DeRouen Esq.

Attorney at DeRouen Law Firm

650 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brad E. Harrigan Esq.

Attorney at Tolar Harrigan & Morris, L.L.C.

1055 Saint Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70130

David King Persons Esq.

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, L.L.P.

1 Galleria Boulevard

Metairie, LA 70001

Kent Andrew Lambert

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.

201 Saint Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Benjamin West Janke

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.

201 Saint Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Tillman Lilly

Attorney at Lilly, P.L.L.C.

4907 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70115

Thomas Patrick Henican

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David King Persons for Appellee Thaddeus Reed in 20-30796. [20-30796] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David King Persons, Esq. for Mr. Thaddeus Reed for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30796] (David King Persons ) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Curtis Bordenave, Brandmixer, Incorporated, Business Moves Consulting, Incorporated and Ms. Paige Lee. Extension Granted to and including 03/19/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/19/2021, for Appellants Curtis Bordenave, Brandmixer, Incorporated, Business Moves Consulting, Incorporated and Paige Lee. [20-30796] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Curtis Bordenave, Brandmixer, Incorporated, Business Moves Consulting, Incorporated and Ms. Paige Lee for filing Appellants' Original Brief until 03/17/2021 [20-30796] (Andrew Tillman Lilly ) [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/17/2021 for Appellants Curtis Bordenave, Brandmixer, Incorporated, Business Moves Consulting, Incorporated and Paige Lee. [20-30796] (DDL) [Entered: 01/05/2021 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-30796] (DDL) [Entered: 01/05/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brad E. Harrigan for Appellees Anthony Lawrence Collection, L.L.C. and Defron Fobb, in case 20-30796. [20-30796] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/04/2021 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Patrick Dominic DeRouen for party(s) Appellee Anthony Lawrence Collection, L.L.C. Appellee Defron Fobb, in case 20-30796 [20-30796] (MAS) [Entered: 12/31/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30796] (Patrick Dominic DeRouen ) [Entered: 12/31/2020 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas Patrick Henican for party(s) Appellant Business Moves Consulting, Incorporated Appellant Curtis Bordenave Appellant Paige Lee Appellant Brandmixer, Incorporated, in case 20-30796 [20-30796] (MAS) [Entered: 12/31/2020 07:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kent Andrew Lambert for Appellee Collegiate Licensing Company, L.L.C. in 20-30796 [20-30796] (MRW) [Entered: 12/24/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Benjamin West Janke for party(s) Appellee Collegiate Licensing Company, L.L.C., in case 20-30796 [20-30796] (MRW) [Entered: 12/24/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Camalla K. Guyton is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [20-30796] (LBM) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30796] (Benjamin West Janke ) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30796] (Robert Christopher White ) [Entered: 12/23/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kent Andrew Lambert for Collegiate Licensing Company, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30796] (Kent Andrew Lambert ) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30796] (Andrew Tillman Lilly ) [Entered: 12/22/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:20-CV-839. Electronic ROA due on 01/06/2021. [20-30796] (SEP) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9468140-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-30796] (SEP) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Curtis Bordenave, Brandmixer, Incorporated, Business Moves Consulting, Incorporated and Ms. Paige Lee. [20-30796] (SEP) [Entered: 12/16/2020 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Moves Consulting is a litigant

Latest cases where Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Patrick Henican