This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2019 at 06:08:12 (UTC).

Pacific Coast Building v. CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Pacific Coast Building filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1524

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CERTAINTEED GYPSUM, INC.

SAINT GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLASTICS CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew J. Moore Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Rebecca Rabenstein

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Abigail A. Rives

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Diane Ghrist

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Gabriel Bell

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Richard Gregory Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Adam Michael Greenfield Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jason E. Mueller

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLC

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Matthew Guy Halgren

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Galyn Gafford

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLC

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

W. Scott Hastings Esq.

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

18 #3

supporting document

18 #2

supporting document

18 #1

Motion

17 #2

supporting document

17 #1

Entry of Appearance

#16

(#16) Entry of appearance for Rebecca L. Rabenstein as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588744] [19-1524] [Rebecca Rabenstein] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:26 PM]

#15

(#15) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588507] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:55 PM]

#14

(#14) Entry of appearance for Abigail A. Rives as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588503] [19-1524] [Abigail Rives] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:30 PM]

#13

(#13) Entry of appearance for Adam M. Greenfield as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588501] [19-1524] [Adam Greenfield] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:24 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588491] [19-1524] [Matthew Moore] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:01 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Matthew J. Moore as principal counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588487] [19-1524] [Matthew Moore] [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:58 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Matthew G. Halgren as of counsel for Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587984] [19-1524] [Matthew Halgren] [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:23 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587962] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:38 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Galyn D. Gafford as of counsel for Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587960] [19-1524] [Galyn Gafford] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:33 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Jason E. Mueller as principal counsel for Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587957] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:28 PM]

#2

(#2) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 02/20/2019 by email. [587523] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:54 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 18 ], ERROR: The manner of service on the certificate of service and docket report do not match. CORRECTION: In future filings, please ensure the manner of service on the certificate of service and docket report match. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [596300] [MMA] [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 18 ] filed by Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. Appellant's brief is due 05/10/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [596296] [MMA] [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION of Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. to extend the time to 05/10/2019 to file the Brief of Appellant. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/28/2019 by email. [596228] [19-1524] [W. Hastings] [Entered: 03/28/2019 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Entry of appearance for W. Scott Hastings as of counsel for Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 03/28/2019 by email. [596194] [19-1524] [W. Hastings] [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Entry of appearance for Rebecca L. Rabenstein as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588744] [19-1524] [Rebecca Rabenstein] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588507] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Entry of appearance for Abigail A. Rives as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588503] [19-1524] [Abigail Rives] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Entry of appearance for Adam M. Greenfield as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588501] [19-1524] [Adam Greenfield] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Diane E. Ghrist as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588500] [19-1524] [Diane Ghrist] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Richard G. Frenkel as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588497] [19-1524] [Richard Frenkel] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Gabriel K. Bell as of counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588495] [19-1524] [Gabriel Bell] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588493] [19-1524] [Matthew Moore] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588491] [19-1524] [Matthew Moore] [Entered: 02/25/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Matthew J. Moore as principal counsel for Appellees CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. and Saint Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588487] [19-1524] [Matthew Moore] [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Matthew G. Halgren as of counsel for Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587984] [19-1524] [Matthew Halgren] [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587962] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Galyn D. Gafford as of counsel for Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587960] [19-1524] [Galyn Gafford] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Jason E. Mueller as principal counsel for Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2019 by US mail, email. [587957] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 02/20/2019 by email. [587523] [19-1524] [Jason Mueller] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/07/2019. [584966] Entry of Appearance due 02/25/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/25/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/25/2019. Appellant's brief is due 04/12/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.