This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/20/2021 at 06:38:25 (UTC).

PA Professional Liability v. Governor of Pennsylvania, et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 PA Professional Liability filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Governor of Pennsylvania. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1099

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA

Defendant / Appellant

GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA

Plaintiff / Appellee

PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY JOINT UNDERWRITING ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Karen M. Romano Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Sean A. Kirkpatrick Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Spencer R. Short Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael D. O'Mara Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jonathan F. Bloom Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Karl S. Myers Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin J. McKeon Esq.

Attorney at Hawke McKeon & Sniscak

100 North Tenth Street, P.O. Box 1778

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Dennis Whitaker Esq.

Attorney at Hawke McKeon & Sniscak

100 North Tenth Street, P.O. Box 1778

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Melissa A. Chapaska Esq.

Attorney at Hawke McKeon & Sniscak

100 North Tenth Street, P.O. Box 1778

Harrisburg, PA 17101

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

18 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

18 #1

Standing Order

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#6

#4

#3

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion granted. The opening briefs by Appellants General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the Governor of Pennsylvania, opening as to their issues on appeal in Nos. 21-1099 and 21-1112; and the joint appendix pertaining to all three (3) appeals must be filed and served on or before March 29, 2021. The remainder of the briefing schedule remains in effect, filed [21-1099, 21-1112, 21-1155] (PDB) [Entered: 03/16/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Governor of Pennsylvania in 21-1112, Appellee Governor of Pennsylvania in 21-1099, 21-1155 for Extension of Time to file Appellants' opening briefs and the joint appendix until/for 7 days. Certificate of Service dated 03/10/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1112, 21-1099, 21-1155] (SAK) [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. 1st Brief on behalf of Brief on behalf of Appellant General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and Appellee Governor of Pennsylvania due on or before 03/22/2021. Appendix due on or before 03/22/2021. [21-1099, 21-1112, 21-1155] (PDB) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin J. McKeon on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association. [21-1099] (KJM) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Melissa A. Chapaska on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association. [21-1099] (MAC) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis A. Whitaker on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association. [21-1099] (DW) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Melissa A. Chapaska, Esq. for Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association, Kevin J. McKeon, Esq. for Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association and Dennis Whitaker, Esq. for Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/19/2021. (PDB) [Entered: 02/05/2021 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean A. Kirkpatrick on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pennsylvania. [21-1099] (SAK) [Entered: 02/04/2021 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Spencer R. Short on behalf of Appellant(s) General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [21-1099] (SRS) [Entered: 02/03/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan F. Bloom on behalf of Appellant(s) General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [21-1099] (JFB) [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER (Clerk) Plaintiff Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association has filed a cross-appeal to Appeal Nos. 21-1099 and 21-1112, which were previously consolidated. At the appropriate time, the Clerk will issue the following four-step briefing schedule covering all three appeals, filed.. [21-1099, 21-1112, 21-1155] See Order for full text. (PDB) [Entered: 01/28/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [21-1099] (KSM) [Entered: 01/28/2021 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [21-1099] (KSM) [Entered: 01/28/2021 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Shuey, L.. [21-1099] (KSM) [Entered: 01/28/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Karl S. Myers on behalf of Appellant(s) General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [21-1099] (KSM) [Entered: 01/28/2021 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 21-1099 and 21-1112 for scheduling, joint appendix, the plaintiff's/appellee's response brief, and disposition. [21-1099, 21-1112] (AMR) [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Karl S. Myers, Esq., Michael D. O'Mara, Esq., Spencer R. Short, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 02/02/2021. (AMR) [Entered: 01/19/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 01/19/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in District Court No. 1-19-cv-01121. (AMR) [Entered: 01/19/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY JOINT UNDERWRITING ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant