This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 06:05:11 (UTC).

Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, et al v. Converteam SAS

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Converteam SAS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11930

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

OUTOKUMPU STAINLESS USA, LLC

AIG EUROPE LIMITED

SOMPO JAPAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

TAPIOLA GENERAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE, PLC

MSI CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD.

POHJOLA INSURANCE LIMITED

HDI GERLING UK BRANCH

AXA CORPORATE SOLUTIONS ASSURANCE SA UK BRANCH

Defendant / Appellant

CONVERTEAM SAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Devin Clarke Dolive

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

420 N 20Th St Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Ricardo A. Woods

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

11 N Water St Ste 22200, Po Box 2287

Mobile, AL 36602

Mark Edward Spear

Attorney at Spear Spear & Hamby, PC

Po Box 1347

Mobile, AL 36633

Taylor Barr Johnson

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

11 N Water St Ste 22200, Po Box 2287

Mobile, AL 36602

Eddie Travis Ramey

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

420 N 20Th St Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joseph James Ferrini

Attorney at Clausen Miller, PC

10 S Lasalle St Ste 1600

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Sara Anne Ford

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35126

Wesley B. Gilchrist

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35126

Amie Adelia Vague

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35126

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Converteam SAS. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/05/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:05 AM]

Open Document

Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Unknown Reporter as to Appellant Converteam SAS. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 05/31/2019. [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:30 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Eddie Travis Ramey for Appellee Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11930] (ECF: Eddie Ramey) [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:18 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sara Anne Ford for Appellant Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:27 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11930] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:05 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Converteam SAS, Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 02/27/2019. [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:23 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Wesley B. Gilchrist for Appellant Converteam SAS. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11930] (ECF: Wesley Gilchrist) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sara Anne Ford for Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amie Adelia Vague for Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Amie Vague) [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wesley B. Gilchrist for Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Wesley Gilchrist) [Entered: 05/23/2019 12:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph Ferrini -Sompo Japan Insurance Co of America Pohjola Insurance Limited AIG Europe Limited Tapiola General Mutual Insurance Co. AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance SA UK Branch HDI Gerling UK Branch MSI Corporate Capital Ltd Royal &Sun Alliance PLC [19-11930] (ECF: Joseph Ferrini) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:10 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Devin Clarke Dolive for Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC. [19-11930] (ECF: Devin Dolive) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:46 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by E. Travis Ramey for Appellee Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC [19-11930] (ECF: Eddie Ramey) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:38 PM]

Open Document #4

District Court Order, DE # 110

Open Document #3

District Court Report and Recommendations, DE # 107

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Converteam SAS. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/05/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Filer: Converteam SAS, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 06/24/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 02/27/2019. [Entered: 06/25/2019 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Unknown Reporter as to Appellant Converteam SAS. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 05/31/2019. [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Eddie Travis Ramey for Appellee Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11930] (ECF: Eddie Ramey) [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sara Anne Ford for Appellant Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11930] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Sara Anne Ford for Converteam SAS, Wesley B. Gilchrist for Converteam SAS and Amie Adelia Vague for Converteam SAS. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Converteam SAS, Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 02/27/2019. [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Wesley B. Gilchrist for Appellant Converteam SAS. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11930] (ECF: Wesley Gilchrist) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sara Anne Ford for Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amie Adelia Vague for Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Amie Vague) [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wesley B. Gilchrist for Converteam SAS. [19-11930] (ECF: Wesley Gilchrist) [Entered: 05/23/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph Ferrini -Sompo Japan Insurance Co of America Pohjola Insurance Limited AIG Europe Limited Tapiola General Mutual Insurance Co. AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance SA UK Branch HDI Gerling UK Branch MSI Corporate Capital Ltd Royal &Sun Alliance PLC [19-11930] (ECF: Joseph Ferrini) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Devin Clarke Dolive for Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC. [19-11930] (ECF: Devin Dolive) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by E. Travis Ramey for Appellee Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC [19-11930] (ECF: Eddie Ramey) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Converteam SAS on 05/17/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/31/2019 as to Appellant Converteam SAS. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/14/2019 as to Appellee Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC [Entered: 05/20/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.