This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/25/2021 at 06:04:51 (UTC).

Ortiz v. Inguran

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 Ortiz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Inguran. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20221

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Angel Ortiz

Defendant / Appellee

Inguran, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Nathan Eugene Inurria

Attorney at Farah Law Group, P.L.L.C.

1211 Hyde Park Boulevard

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Brian Glenn Patterson

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, L.L.P.

1111 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/28/2021 for Appellant Angel Ortiz. [21-20221] (CMB) [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No [21-20221] (CMB) [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9562966-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/14/2021 for Appellant Angel Ortiz [21-20221] (CCR) [Entered: 04/29/2021 04:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Angel Ortiz [21-20221] (CAG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less