This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/27/2022 at 05:18:11 (UTC).

Orlando Garcia v. Peter Beck, et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Orlando Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Peter Beck. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15594

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

ORLANDO GARCIA

Defendant / Appellants

PETER J. BECK, in individual and representative capacity as Trustee of The Beck Family Trust

REGINA BECK, in individual and representative capacity as Trustee of The Beck Family Trust

LOLA'S CHICKEN SHACK, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Zachary M. Best Esquire

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dennis J. Price Esquire II

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Catherine M. Corfee Esquire

Attorney at Corfee Stone & Associates

P.O. Box 1098

Carmichael, CA 95609

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Dennis J. Price II for party(s) Appellee Orlando Garcia. [12430551] (RL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Dennis Jay Price II (100 Pine Street Suite 1250 San Francisco CA 94111) for Appellee Orlando Garcia. Date of service: 04/25/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12430543] [22-15594] (Price, Dennis) [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Peter J. Beck, Regina Beck and Lola's Chicken Shack, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/02/2022. Appellants Peter J. Beck, Regina Beck and Lola's Chicken Shack, LLC opening brief due 06/20/2022. Appellee Orlando Garcia answering brief due 07/20/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12429975] (JBS) [Entered: 04/25/2022 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine Mary Corfee