This case was last updated from PACER on 01/16/2021 at 06:09:57 (UTC).

Orlando Cordia Hall v. T. J. Watson

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Orlando Cordia Hall filed a Prisoner - Death Penalty lawsuit against T J Watson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3229

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Death Penalty

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

T. J. WATSON, Warden

Petitioner / Appellant

ORLANDO CORDIA HALL

Amicus Curiae

NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Bob Wood

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Ten W. Market Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3048

Jonathan Glen Bradshaw

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242

Brian W. McKay

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Kaitlyn Golden

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street N.W., Columbia Square

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Pieter H.B. Van Tol III

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

390 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Kathryn Marshall Ali

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street N.W., Columbia Square

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Jin Hee Lee

Attorney at NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND

700 14Th Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Sherrilyn Ann Ifill

Attorney at NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND

40 Rector Street

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Mandate

Open Document #1

Certified order

#23

(#23) Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [23] [7133493] [20-3229] (LJ) [Entered: 01/11/2021 09:01 AM]

#20

(#20) Filed order from the Supreme Court re: 20-697 & 20A101. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. [20] [7123015] [20-3229] (JR) [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:56 PM]

19 #2

S.C. Notice of Docketing Letter

19 #1

S.C. Petition for Certiorari filed

#18

(#18) ORDER: The district courts judgment is AFFIRMED. The motion to stay execution, which Hall renewed in this court, is DENIED. (See order for details) Diane S. Sykes, Chief Circuit Judge; David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge and Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge. [18] [7122820] [20-3229] (AP) [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:20 AM]

#16

(#16) Filed District Court order dated 11/18/2020. Mr. Hall's motion to stay execution pending appeal and for stay pending disposition of stay motion by the Seventh Circuit, dkt. [23], is DENIED. Forwarded to AK. [16] [7122719] [20-3229] (JR) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:40 AM]

#15

(#15) Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. per order. Paper copies due on 11/20/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [15] [7122715] [20-3229] (LJ) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:08 AM]

#7

(#7) Appellant's Combined Brief and Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. Paper copies due on 11/20/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [7] [7122515] [20-3229]--[Text updated 11/18/2020 by JR.] (LJ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 11:53 AM]

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. [4] [7122472] [20-3229] (Ali, Kathryn) [Entered: 11/18/2020 11:00 AM]

#3

(#3) ORDER issued GRANTING joint motion to set expedited briefing schedule. Briefing in this matter will proceed as follows: 1. Appellants Combined Brief and Motion to Stay Execution, and Appendix are due by 1:00 pm on November 18, 2020. 2. Appellees Combined Response to Motion to Stay and Appellees Brief is due by 9:00 pm on November 18, 2020. 3. Appellants Combined Reply in Support of Motion to Stay and Appellants Reply Brief is due by 12:00 am on November 19, 2020. [ # 2 ] AK [3] [7122468] [20-3229] (CMD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:49 AM]

#2

(#3) ORDER issued GRANTING joint motion to set expedited briefing schedule. Briefing in this matter will proceed as follows: 1. Appellants Combined Brief and Motion to Stay Execution, and Appendix are due by 1:00 pm on November 18, 2020. 2. Appellees Combined Response to Motion to Stay and Appellees Brief is due by 9:00 pm on November 18, 2020. 3. Appellants Combined Reply in Support of Motion to Stay and Appellants Reply Brief is due by 12:00 am on November 19, 2020. [ # 2 ] AK [3] [7122468] [20-3229] (CMD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:49 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Death Penalty Case

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 11/19/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7133498-2] [7133498] [20-3229] (LJ) [Entered: 01/11/2021 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [23] [7133493] [20-3229] (LJ) [Entered: 01/11/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#22) Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. [22] [7123216] [20-3229] (DRS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#21) Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [21] [7123209] [20-3229] (DRS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Filed order from the Supreme Court re: 20-697 & 20A101. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. [20] [7123015] [20-3229] (JR) [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Filed notice from the Supreme Court of the filing of a Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 20-697 [19] [7123014] [20-3229]--[Edited 11/20/2020 by PS - to attach official Supreme Court notice of docketing of petition for writ of certiorari.] (JR) [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: The district courts judgment is AFFIRMED. The motion to stay execution, which Hall renewed in this court, is DENIED. (See order for details) Diane S. Sykes, Chief Circuit Judge; David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge and Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge. [18] [7122820] [20-3229] (AP) [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket(#17) Paper copies of appellant brief and separate appendix filed by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. [17] [7122771] [20-3229] (CO) [Entered: 11/19/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed District Court order dated 11/18/2020. Mr. Hall's motion to stay execution pending appeal and for stay pending disposition of stay motion by the Seventh Circuit, dkt. [23], is DENIED. Forwarded to AK. [16] [7122719] [20-3229] (JR) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. per order. Paper copies due on 11/20/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [15] [7122715] [20-3229] (LJ) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Submitted appellee brief by Jonathan Bradshaw for Appellee T. J. Watson. NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee T. J. Watson to to Appellant's Brief and Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution Pending Appeal. [10][7122701] [20-3229]--[Edited 11/18/2020 by CMD to reflect submitted brief.] [10][7122701] [20-3229]--[Edited 11/18/2020 by CMD] (Bradshaw, Jonathan) [Entered: 11/18/2020 08:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Non-Party Motion for Leave to Submit Amicus Curiae Brief by NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [7122700] [20-3229] (Lee, Jin Hee) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed Supplemental Appendix by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. [8] [7122517] Paper copies due on 11/20/2020. [20-3229] (LJ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Appellant's Combined Brief and Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. Paper copies due on 11/20/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [7] [7122515] [20-3229]--[Text updated 11/18/2020 by JR.] (LJ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted Supplemental Appendix by Kathryn Ali for Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. [6] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7122514] [20-3229] (Ali, Kathryn) [Entered: 11/18/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Submitted appellant brief by Kathryn Ali for Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. [5] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7122512] [20-3229] (Ali, Kathryn) [Entered: 11/18/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall. [4] [7122472] [20-3229] (Ali, Kathryn) [Entered: 11/18/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER issued GRANTING joint motion to set expedited briefing schedule. Briefing in this matter will proceed as follows: 1. Appellants Combined Brief and Motion to Stay Execution, and Appendix are due by 1:00 pm on November 18, 2020. 2. Appellees Combined Response to Motion to Stay and Appellees Brief is due by 9:00 pm on November 18, 2020. 3. Appellants Combined Reply in Support of Motion to Stay and Appellants Reply Brief is due by 12:00 am on November 19, 2020. [ # 2 ] AK [3] [7122468] [20-3229] (CMD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Joint motion filed by Appellant Orlando Cordia Hall and Appellee T. J. Watson To set expedited briefing schedule. [2] [7122408] [20-3229] (Ali, Kathryn) [Entered: 11/18/2020 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Death penalty case. Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 12/01/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/28/2020 for Orlando Cordia Hall. [1] [7122381] [20-3229] (JR) [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherrilyn Ann Ifill