Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 06:08:44 (UTC).

Oriska Insurance Company v. Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Oriska Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3206

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

US Management, Inc.

Rashbi Management, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

Shorefront Operating, LLC, DBA Seagate Rehabilitation & Healthcare Center

Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, DBA Park Avenue Extended Care Facility

New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC

Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC

Sentosacare, LLC

North Sea Associates, LLC, DBA The Hamptons Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing

Samuel Schlesinger, Individually and as Principal Partner and as Officer, Director and Owner of Allstate ASO, Inc. and Allstate Administrators, LLC

Nassau Operating Company, LLC, DBA Nassau Extended Care Facility, DBA Nassau Rehabilitation and Nursing, DBA Center/Kingsbridge Heights Receiver, LLC

Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, DBA Throgs Neck Extended Care Facility

Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center

Isaac Muller, Individually and as an Agent for the Defendants herein named

Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC, DBA Spring Creek Rehabilitation & Nursing Care Center

Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC

Little Neck Care Center, LLC

Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC

Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, DBA Pathways Nursing & Rehabilitation Center

White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Oriska Insurance Company

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.

Attorney at Cullen and Dykman LLP

80 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

Ira S. Lipsius Esq.

Attorney at Lipsius-Benhaim Law LLP

80-02 Kew Gardens Road

Kew Gardens, NY 11415

Nicholas John Faso Esq.

Attorney at Cullen and Dykman LLP

80 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

Timothy Chorba

Attorney at Cullen and Dykman LLP

80 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

Kevin James Harrington

Attorney at Harrington, Ocko & Monk, LLP

81 Main Street

White Plains, NY 10601

Michael Walter Freudenberg Esq.

Attorney at Harrington, Ocko & Monk, LLP

81 Main Street

White Plains, NY 10601

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel L. Hitzke

Attorney at Hitzke & Ferran, LLP

100 Oceangate

Long Beach, CA 90802

Daniel L. Hitzke Esq.

Attorney at Hitzke & Ferran, LLP

100 Oceangate

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702700] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:22 PM]

35 #1

Form C FILED

#33

(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Isaac Muller, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2701935] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:37 AM]

#32

(#32) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [31], on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED.[2701802] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 08:19 AM]

#27

(#29) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [13], [ # 24 ], [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2690572] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:06 PM]

#24

(#29) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [13], [ # 24 ], [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2690572] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:06 PM]

#22

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#11

(#11) ORDER, dated 10/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/12/2019, unless Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2686351] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/22/2019 05:57 PM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE, to Appellees Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2686339] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/22/2019 05:42 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2673905] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:57 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 32 ], [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED.[2703112] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/12/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702876] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 07:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702700] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702698] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ATTORNEY, Michael Walter Freudenberg for Isaac Muller, in case 19-3206, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2701956] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Isaac Muller, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2701935] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [31], on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED.[2701802] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • (#31) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2701742] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/07/2019 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ATTORNEY, Nicholas John Faso for Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center Pinegrove Manor II, LLC Shorefront Operating, LLC Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Little Neck Care Center, LLC Niskayuna Operating Co LLC Samuel Schlesinger Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC Sentosacare, LLC Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. Townhouse Operating Company, LLC Bent Philipson Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC Garden Care Center, Inc. Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Allstate Administrators, LLC Nassau Operating Company, LLC Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc. Bayview Manor LLC North Sea Associates, LLC, in case 19-3206, [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2690576] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [13], [ # 24 ], [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2690572] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • (#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2687465] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER, dated 10/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/12/2019, unless Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2686351] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/22/2019 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE, to Appellees Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2686339] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/22/2019 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Isaac Muller, FILED. Service date 10/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2678957] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/14/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Daniel L. Hitzke for Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2673913] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2673909] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, district court receipt # ANYNDC-4888592, FILED.[2673907] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2673905] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2673903] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. [2673897] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rashbi Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oriska Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Lee Hitzke