This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/12/2021 at 06:13:43 (UTC).

Oriental Financial Group, Inc., et al v. Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Oriental Financial Group, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1015

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

ORIENTAL BANK

ORIENTAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.

ORIENTAL FINANCIAL SERVICES CORP.

Defendant / Appellant

COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO ORIENTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez

Attorney at McConnell Valdes LLC

270 Munoz Rivera Ave, Po Box 364225

San Juan, PR 00936-4225

Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera

Attorney at McConnell Valdes LLC

270 Munoz Rivera Ave, Po Box 364225

San Juan, PR 00936-4225

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Veronica Ferraiuoli Hornedo

Attorney at Estudio Legal Ferraiuoli, PSC

Po Box 195384

San Juan, PR 00919-5384

Carla Ferrari-Lugo

Po Box 988

Aguadilla, PR 00605-0988

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS report filed by Appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental. Certificate of service dated 03/04/2021. [21-1015] (CF) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file a status report by 03/18/2021 or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [21-1015] (GB) [Entered: 03/04/2021 05:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental in 21-1015 filed by Attorney Veronica Ferraiuoli Hornedo. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2021. [21-1015] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 18-2111. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (VF) [Entered: 01/27/2021 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental in 21-1015 indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2021. [21-1015] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 18-2111. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CF) [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental in 21-1015. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2021. [21-1015] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 18-2111. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CF) [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental in 21-1015 filed by Attorney Carla Ferrari. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2021. [21-1015] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 18-2111. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CF) [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 02/09/2021 . [21-1015] (GB) [Entered: 01/26/2021 07:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered. Appellant is directed to file a status report by February 24, 2021 and at thirty day intervals thereafter, informing this court of any action taken by the district court on the post-judgment motion. Further, the appellant is directed to inform this court whether or not it intends to file a notice of appeal or amended notice of appeal from the district court's post-judgment order. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal of this appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. Once the district court rules on the pending motion, it is directed to forward its decision to this court forthwith. [21-1015] (GB) [Entered: 01/25/2021 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #236) filed by Appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Oriental. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 01/25/2021. [21-1015] (MNH) [Entered: 01/11/2021 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Financial Services Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO ORIENTAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Veronica Ferraiuoli Hornedo