This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2022 at 16:06:24 (UTC).

Oracle America, Inc. v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 Oracle America, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-1118

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Amicus Curiae

STEVE WOZNIAK

AMERICAN PHOTOGRAPHIC ARTISTS

JOSEPH SCOTT MILLER

JOSHUA DAVID SARNOFF

ZHI DING

ROGER ALLAN FORD

DAVE SNIGIER

YVETTE JOY LIEBESMAN

BEN DEPOORTER

JESSICA SILBEY, Esq.

JOHN HENNESSY

MARY SHAW

RONALD L. RIVEST

GUIDO VAN ROSSUM

KEN CASTLEMAN

BJARNE STROUSTRUP

JON A. BAUMGARTEN

MIGUEL DE ICAZA

DOUG LEA

Defendant / Cross Appellant

GOOGLE LLC

149 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Phillip R. Malone

Attorney at Stanford Law School

559 Nathan Abbott Way

Stanford, CA 94305

Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman

Attorney at University of Southern California

699 Exposition Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90089

Scott J. Sholder

Attorney at Cowan, DeBaets, Abrahams & Sheppard LLP

41 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Defendant / Cross Appellant Attorneys

Steven A. Hirsch Esq.

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert A. Van Nest Esq.

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

Lisa Wang Bohl

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Charles R. Macedo

Attorney at Amster Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Michael Gregory Pattillo Jr.

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Rayiner Hashem

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Mark S. Davies Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Columbia Center

Washington, DC 20005

Richard M. Brunell

Attorney at Hilliard & Shadowen LLP

1135 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78703

Annemarie Hassett

Attorney at NYU School of Law

139 Macdougal Street

New York, NY 10012

Matthew Sarboraria Esq.

Attorney at Oracle America, Inc.

500 Oracle Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jonathan Band Esq.

Attorney at Jonathan Band PLLC

21 Dupont Circle, Nw, 8Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Lisa Simpson

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Joshua L. Simmons

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, Citigroup Center

New York, NY 10022

Mitchell L. Stoltz Esq.

Attorney at Electronic Frontier Foundation

815 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Kenneth L. Doroshow

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Catherine Crump

Attorney at Samuelson Clinic, Berkeley Law School

Uc Berkeley, School Of Law, 353 Law Building

Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

Daniel J. Brooks

Attorney at Scarola Malone & Zubatov LLP

1700 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

46 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#317

#316

#315

314 #2

Opinion

314 #1

Announcement

#313

#311

310 #3

supporting document

310 #2

supporting document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Key Rule Changes

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

246 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [781361] [MVH] [Entered: 06/21/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#316) ORDER filed. The mandate is recalled solely with respect to fair use. The appeal is reinstated. This court's judgment [ # 243 ] on the question of fair use is vacated. The district court's final judgment in favor of Google is affirmed. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [774946] [MJL] [Entered: 05/14/2021 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#315) Certified judgment of the U.S. Supreme Court issued on 05/07/2021 for 18-956. [773831] [MJL] [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#314) Opinion filed by the U.S. Supreme Court on 04/05/2021 in No. 18-956. The judgment or decision is Reversed/Remanded. [769347] [MJL] [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#313) Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States: The parties are directed to file supplemental letter briefs addressing the appropriate standard of review for the second question presented, including but not limited to the implications of the Seventh Amendment, if any, on that standard. The briefs, not to exceed 10 pages, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, August 7, 2020. [692041] [JAB] [Entered: 05/04/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#312) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney Matthew Bush [ # 311 ] filed by Appellant Oracle America, Inc. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [677552] [JAB] [Entered: 03/10/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#311) MOTION of Appellant Oracle America, Inc. to withdraw counsel Matthew Bush [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/09/2020 by email. [677381] [17-1118] [Matthew Bush] [Entered: 03/09/2020 08:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#310) Record transmitted to the Supreme Court on 02/26/2020. [674375] [JCP] [Entered: 02/26/2020 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#309) Letter from the Supreme Court of the United States requesting the entire record and briefs. [673711] [JCP] [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#308) The petition for writ of certiorari, [18-956], filed on 01/24/2019, was Granted on 11/15/2019. [650218] [JAB] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
297 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Daryl L. Joseffer as principal counsel for Appellee Google Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381694] [Daryl Joseffer] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Peter Bicks as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381670] [Peter Bicks] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Andrew D. Silverman as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381669] [Andrew Silverman] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Jeremy Peterman as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381663] [Jeremy Peterman] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Melanie L. Bostwick as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/09/2016 by email. [381660] [Melanie Bostwick] [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Kelsi B. Corkran as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/07/2016 by email. [380747] [Kelsi Corkran] [Entered: 11/07/2016 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Mark S. Davies as of counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/04/2016 by email. [380568] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 11/04/2016 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/04/2016 by email. [380566] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 11/04/2016 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for E. Joshua Rosenkranz as principal counsel for Appellant Oracle America, Inc.. Service: 11/04/2016 by email. [380564] [E. Rosenkranz] [Entered: 11/04/2016 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/27/2016. [378284] Entry of Appearance due 11/14/2016. Certificate of Interest due 11/14/2016. Docketing Statement due 11/14/2016. Appellant's brief due 12/27/2016. [MJL] [Entered: 10/28/2016 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Simpson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth L. Doroshow