This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:19 (UTC).

Opticurrent, LLC v. Power Integrations, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Opticurrent, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Power Integrations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2141

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

MOUSER ELECTRONICS

Plaintiff / Appellant

OPTICURRENT, LLC

Defendant / Appellees and Defendant / Cross Appellants

POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.

MOUSER ELECTRONICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert Greenspoon

Attorney at Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

333 North Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

Jonathan Tad Suder

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke

604 East 4Th Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Cross Appellant Attorneys

Frank Scherkenbach

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210

Paul V. Storm

Attorney at Foley Gardere Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil Warren

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

500 Arguello Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

John Winston Thornburgh

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

12390 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Michael R. Headley Esq.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

500 Arguello Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

2 #1

Entry of Appearance

#2

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. Suder as of counsel for Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Service: 07/16/2019 by email. [621394] [19-2141] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:59 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Frank E. Scherkenbach as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624293] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:58 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624295] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:01 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624296] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:02 PM]

#9

(#9) Entry of appearance for John Thornburgh as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624297] [19-2141] [John Thornburgh] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:06 PM]

#22

(#22) FILED from Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 09/11/2019 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [634773] [19-2141] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:23 PM]

#20

(#20) FILED from Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 08/30/2019 by email. [632305] [19-2141] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 21 ] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:18 PM]

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Opticurrent, LLC, Opening Brief [ # 20 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/18/2019. The deadline for any responsive filing runs from service of the original version. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [634682] [TAM] [Entered: 09/11/2019 01:15 PM]

#18

(#18) Letter from Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc. Responding to Notice re Mouser Electronics. Service: 08/09/2019 by email. [627438] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 08/09/2019 07:18 PM]

#17

(#17) ORDER If Power Integrations seeks to reform the caption, it should promptly file a motion to that effect. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [625918] [LMS] [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:49 AM]

16 #1

Certificate of Interest

16 #2

Certificate of Service

11 #2

Certificate of Service

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Opticurrent, LLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/06/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [624479] [TAM] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:50 AM]

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) FILED from Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 09/11/2019 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [634773] [19-2141] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Opticurrent, LLC, Opening Brief [ # 20 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/18/2019. The deadline for any responsive filing runs from service of the original version. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [634682] [TAM] [Entered: 09/11/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) FILED from Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 08/30/2019 by email. [632305] [19-2141] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 21 ] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#19) Official caption revised to reflect non-participation of Mouser Electronics. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [628331] [TAM] [Entered: 08/15/2019 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Letter from Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc. Responding to Notice re Mouser Electronics. Service: 08/09/2019 by email. [627438] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 08/09/2019 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER If Power Integrations seeks to reform the caption, it should promptly file a motion to that effect. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [625918] [LMS] [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624622] [19-2141] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#15) Notice to counsel for Appellee Mouser Electronics: The record of this case indicates that the Certificate of Interest has not been filed. A completed certificate of Interest must be submitted in accordance with Fed. Cir. R. 47.4 by 07/31/2019. Additionally, an Entry of Appearance for principal counsel and a Docketing Statement have not been filed. Please file these documents promptly. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [624483] [TAM] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Opticurrent, LLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/06/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [624479] [TAM] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624301] [19-2141] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Michael R. Headley as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624298] [19-2141] [Michael Headley] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for John Thornburgh as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624297] [19-2141] [John Thornburgh] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624296] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624295] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Frank E. Scherkenbach as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant Power Integrations, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624293] [19-2141] [Frank Scherkenbach] [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#5) Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal 19-2172. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [623045] [TAM] [Entered: 07/24/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#4) Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-2141 (Lead) with 19-2172 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [623042] [19-2141, 19-2172] [TAM] [Entered: 07/24/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. Suder as of counsel for Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Service: 07/16/2019 by email. [621394] [19-2141] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Robert P. Greenspoon as principal counsel for Appellant Opticurrent, LLC. Service: 07/16/2019 by email. [621271] [19-2141] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/08/2019. [620956] Entry of Appearance due 07/29/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/29/2019. Docketing Statement due 07/29/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/13/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.