This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2019 at 06:06:24 (UTC).

Onatolu v. Spectrum Televison

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Onatolu filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Spectrum Televison. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-255

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Adekunle A. Onatolu

Mount Vernon, NY 10550

Defendant / Appellee

Spectrum Television

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Adekunle A. Onatolu

217 S 12Th Avenue

Mount Vernon, NY 10550

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Charles Dewey Cole Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.

40 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 02/12/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/05/2019, unless Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2494926] [19-255] [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:04 PM]

19 #1

Opposition FILED

#24

(#24) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Oral Argument Statement, and Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [20], [22], [23], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, copy to pro se, FILED.[2498923] [19-255] [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:08 AM]

#11

(#11) ORDER, dated 02/12/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/05/2019, unless Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2494964] [19-255] [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:13 PM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2483353] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:21 PM]

#33

(#33) PAPERS, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, RECEIVED.[2506223] [19-255] [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:39 AM]

#14

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE, to Appellee Spectrum Television, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2483358] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:23 PM]

#25

(#25) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by hand delivery.[2505813] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:13 PM]

#29

(#29) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [28], [21], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, copy to pro se, FILED.[2505831] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:19 PM]

#8

(#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [5], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483365] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:25 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2483346] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:18 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#13

No Description Available

#26

(#26) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by hand delivery. [2505816] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:14 PM]

19 #2

Bar Order

#18

No Description Available

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P [ # 37 ], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED.[2513403] [19-255] [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. Service date 03/06/2019 by hand delivery.[2513395] [19-255] [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) PAPERS, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, RECEIVED.[2506223] [19-255] [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CURED DEFECTIVE Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 27 ],[ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED.[2505858] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [28], [21], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, copy to pro se, FILED.[2505831] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • (#28) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by hand delivery.[2505826] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for discrimination, on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by hand delivery.[2505822] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by hand delivery. [2505816] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by hand delivery.[2505813] [19-255] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Oral Argument Statement, and Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [20], [22], [23], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, copy to pro se, FILED.[2498923] [19-255] [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER, dated 02/12/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/05/2019, unless Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2494964] [19-255] [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 02/12/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/05/2019, unless Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2494926] [19-255] [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [5], on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483365] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE, to Appellee Spectrum Television, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2483358] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2483353] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • (#5) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. No Service.[2483351] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2483347] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2483346] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 01/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2483342] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Adekunle A. Onatolu, FILED. [2483337] [19-255] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.