This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/05/2020 at 05:11:48 (UTC).

Omni MedSci, Inc. v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Omni MedSci, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-119

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN

APPLE INC.

Respondent

OMNI MEDSCI, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

J. Michael Huget

Attorney at Honigman LLP

315 East Eisenhower Parkway

Ann Arbor, MI 48108

Jeffrey Paul Kushan Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1501 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Respondent Attorney

Thomas A. Lewry Esq.

Attorney at Brooks Kushman PC

1000 Town Center

Southfield, MI 48075

 

Court Documents

8 #2

supporting document

8 #1

Motion

6 #10

supporting document

6 #9

supporting document

6 #8

supporting document

6 #7

supporting document

#6

supporting document

6 #5

supporting document

6 #4

supporting document

6 #3

supporting document

6 #2

supporting document

6 #1

Motion

#5

#4

#2

Addendum

2 #1

Petition for Permission to Appeal

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#10) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-118 Lead with 20-119 Member Case. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [676286] [20-118, 20-119] [JAL] [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER consolidating the petitions (20-118, 20-119), and thus one set of briefing should be filed for the two petitions. The revised official caption is reflected above. Any response to the petitions [ # 675826-2 ] [ # 2 ] is due within seven days of the date of issuance of this order. Any reply is due no later than three days thereafter. A single response, if any, to the University of Michigan's motions [ # 676019-2 ] [ # 6 ] [ # 676021-2 ] [ # 8 ] is due no later than seven days from the date of issuance of this order. Any reply is due three days thereafter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [676209] [20-118, 20-119] [LMS] [Entered: 03/04/2020 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of The Regents of The University of Michigan to seal document confidential document [7] [Consent: opposed]. Service: 03/03/2020 by email. [676024] [20-119] [J. Michael Huget] [Entered: 03/03/2020 07:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Confidential Brief Amicus Curiae of The Regents of The University of Michigan In Support of Apple Inc.'s Petition from The Regents of The University of Michigan corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 6 ]. Service: 03/03/2020 by email. [676023] [20-119] [J. Michael Huget] [Entered: 03/03/2020 07:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION of The Regents of The University of Michigan for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [Consent: opposed]. Service: 03/03/2020 by email. [676022] [20-119] [J. Michael Huget] [Entered: 03/03/2020 07:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for J. Michael Huget as principal counsel for The Regents of The University of Michigan. Service: 03/03/2020 by email. [676018] [20-119] [J. Michael Huget] [Entered: 03/03/2020 06:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION of Petitioner Apple Inc. to waive confidentiality requirements [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/24/2020 by email. [675842] [JAL] [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Confidential PETITION of Petitioner Apple Inc. for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b), Fed. R. App. P. 5 corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 02/24/2020 by email. [675841] [JAL] [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner Apple Inc. for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b), Fed. R. App. P. 5 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/24/2020 by email. [675837] [JAL] [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 02/24/2020. [675835] Entry of Appearance is due 03/17/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/17/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OMNI MEDSCI, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Regents Of The University Of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Paul Kushan Esq.