This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2020 at 06:10:47 (UTC).

Omar Hason Bey v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Omar Hason Bey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gavin Newsom. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55056

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

RYAN WARDLE, Municipal Officer for the City of Anaheim

GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor of California

TOKS OMISHAKIN, Director of Department of Transportation

Plaintiff / Appellant

OMAR AMIR HASON BEY

Anaheim, CA 92804

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Omar Amir Hason Bey

207 South Camellia Street

Anaheim, CA 92804

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Omar Amir Hason Bey opening brief (Informal: No) 6 pages. Served via ECF on 03/09/2020. Major deficiencies: IFP motion pending, briefing stayed. [11623187] (KT) [Entered: 03/09/2020 02:30 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Omar Amir Hason Bey statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 01/26/2020. [11585353] (RL) [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:23 PM]

3 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Omar Amir Hason Bey motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/13/2020. [11563734] (JBS) [Entered: 01/15/2020 02:43 PM]

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Omar Amir Hason Bey opening brief (Informal: No) 6 pages. Served via ECF on 03/09/2020. Major deficiencies: IFP motion pending, briefing stayed. [11623187] (KT) [Entered: 03/09/2020 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Omar Amir Hason Bey statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 01/26/2020. [11585353] (RL) [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court denied appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis in part because it found that the action was frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal or statement that the appeal should go forward. [11569937] (CKP) [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Omar Amir Hason Bey motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/13/2020. [11563734] (JBS) [Entered: 01/15/2020 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Omar Amir Hason Bey opening brief due 03/13/2020. [11563715] (JBS) [Entered: 01/15/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gavin Newsom, Governor of California is a litigant