This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/14/2020 at 06:21:04 (UTC).

Olson v. Major League Baseball

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Olson filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Major League Baseball. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1841

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Appellant

New York Yankees Partnership

Defendants

John Does 1-50

Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P.

Houston Astros, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellees

Warren Barber, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Christopher Clifford, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Kristopher R. Olson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Christopher Lopez, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Erik Liptak, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellants

Major League Baseball

MLB Advanced Media, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Jonathan D. Schiller

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

David S. Golub Esq.

Steven L. Bloch Esq.

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Hannah Lonky Fackler Esq.

Benjamin R. Walker Esq.

John L. Hardiman Esq.

 

Court Documents

#22

#16

#13

#117

#116

#115

#114

#113

#112

#111

#110

#109

#34

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

9 #2

Case FILED

9 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 8, (pp. 741-990), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907811] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 8, (pp. 678-740), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907810] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 8, (pp. 641-677), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907808] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 8, (pp. 598-640), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907807] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 8, (pp. 519-597), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907805] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 8, (pp. 448-518), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907804] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 8, (pp. 301-447), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907802] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 8, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1841, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907800] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907796] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Special Appendix, Joint Appendix, [66], [67], [68], [69], [70], [71], [72], [73], [74], on behalf of of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, FILED.[2906974] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Major League Baseball and MLB Advanced Media, L.P., FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2872311] [20-1841] [Entered: 06/26/2020 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION, to expedite motion, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson in 20-1831, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF. [2872148] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak, Christopher Lopez and Kristopher R. Olson, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2867861] [20-1841] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant New York Yankees Partnership, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2867408] [20-1841] [Entered: 06/22/2020 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Kristopher R. Olson, Warren Barber, Christopher Clifford, Erik Liptak and Christopher Lopez , FILED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2866677] [20-1831, 20-1841] [Entered: 06/19/2020 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTE: See lead case, 20-1831, containing complete set of docket entries.[2863575] [20-1841] [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2863582] [20-1841] [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball and New York Yankees Partnership, USCA receipt # ANYSDC-20255431, FILED.[2863572] [20-1841] [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 06/12/2020, RECEIVED.[2863566] [20-1841] [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball and New York Yankees Partnership in 20-1841, FILED. [2863553] [20-1841, 20-1831] [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less