This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 06:08:04 (UTC).

Oliver Bolotin, et al v. 3M Company, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Oliver Bolotin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1838

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Clarence Gallinger

Lawanda Drayton

Maurice Saxton

Charles Wilkerson

Theron Graham

Frank Segoviano, Jr.

Anthony Brazil

Benjamin El

Jeffrey Bradley

David Riggins

William Smith

Lisa Lunsford

Shamailla White

Alan McKittrick

Sergio Flores

Donald Tapley

Kenny Irizarry

Glenn Collins

Bobby Davis

Defendant / Appellant

3M Company

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew James Barber

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Amanda M. Williams

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

William R. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Alicia N. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jerry Blackwell

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Benjamin Winters Hulse

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

S. Jamal Faleel

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Andrew Crowder

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Other Attorneys

Faris A. Rashid

Attorney at GREENE & ESPEL

Suite 2200, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Mr. Oliver Bolotin, Mr. Jeffrey Bradley, Mr. Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Mr. Glenn Collins, Mr. Bobby Davis, Ms. Lawanda Drayton, Mr. Benjamin El, Mr. Sergio Flores, Mr. Nichalaus Franco, Mr. Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Mr. Kenny Irizarry, Mr. Henry Jepsen, Mr. Curtis King, Mr. Raymond Lapollo, Ms. Lisa Lunsford, Mr. Alan McKittrick, Mr. Joseph Moriarty, Mr. David Riggins, Mr. Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Mr. Maurice Saxton, Mr. Frank Segoviano, Jr., William Smith, Mr. Gino Socciarelli, Mr. Donald Tapley, Mr. Daniel Taylor, Mr. Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Mr. Charles Wilkerson, Mr. Todd Wilson and Mr. Steven Yorkey w/service 04/19/2021 [5026748] [21-1838] (DEG) [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:10 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026672] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:32 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026670] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:30 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026668] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:29 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. No Transcript[5042298] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:50 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195 - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/04/2021 [5042295] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:45 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. - FOR CAL [5042291] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:43 PM]

Open Document

**CONSOLIDATED** BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/06/2021. Appendix due 07/16/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 07/16/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5040092] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2021 05:02 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850 - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/22/2021 [5028257] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:17 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850. - FOR CAL [5028255] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:15 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, memorandum opinion and order granting remand filed 3/24/2021, judgment filed 3/26/2021, and notice of appeal filed 4/13/2021. [5025942] [21-1838] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:19 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5025936] [21-1838] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:14 PM]

Open Document

*CONSOLIDATED* BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/26/2021. Appendix due 06/07/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 06/07/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5026322] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (CBO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 10:15 AM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. No Transcript[5042298] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195 - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/04/2021 [5042295] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. - FOR CAL [5042291] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket**CONSOLIDATED** BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/06/2021. Appendix due 07/16/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 07/16/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5040092] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2021 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850 - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/22/2021 [5028257] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850. - FOR CAL [5028255] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Mr. Oliver Bolotin, Mr. Jeffrey Bradley, Mr. Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Mr. Glenn Collins, Mr. Bobby Davis, Ms. Lawanda Drayton, Mr. Benjamin El, Mr. Sergio Flores, Mr. Nichalaus Franco, Mr. Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Mr. Kenny Irizarry, Mr. Henry Jepsen, Mr. Curtis King, Mr. Raymond Lapollo, Ms. Lisa Lunsford, Mr. Alan McKittrick, Mr. Joseph Moriarty, Mr. David Riggins, Mr. Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Mr. Maurice Saxton, Mr. Frank Segoviano, Jr., William Smith, Mr. Gino Socciarelli, Mr. Donald Tapley, Mr. Daniel Taylor, Mr. Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Mr. Charles Wilkerson, Mr. Todd Wilson and Mr. Steven Yorkey w/service 04/19/2021 [5026748] [21-1838] (DEG) [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026672] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026670] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026668] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*CONSOLIDATED* BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/26/2021. Appendix due 06/07/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 06/07/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5026322] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (CBO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of docket entries, memorandum opinion and order granting remand filed 3/24/2021, judgment filed 3/26/2021, and notice of appeal filed 4/13/2021. [5025942] [21-1838] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5025936] [21-1838] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faris Rashid