This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 06:05:01 (UTC).

Old Dominion Electric v. PJM Interconnection, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Old Dominion Electric filed an Other lawsuit against PJM Interconnection, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1483

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

PJM INTERCONNECTION, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

OLD DOMINION ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lucas M. Walker

Attorney at MOLOLAMKEN, LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Jeffrey A. Lamken

Attorney at MOLOLAMKEN, LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Brian Adam Wright

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Robert Martin Rolfe

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Jennifer Elizabeth Fischell

Attorney at MOLOLAMKEN, LLP

430 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Brian A. Wright

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kenneth Thomas Stout

Attorney at MILES & STOCKBRIDGE PC

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

John MacDonald Robb III

Attorney at MILES & STOCKBRIDGE PC

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Thomas M. Wolf Esq.

Attorney at MILES & STOCKBRIDGE PC

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Joseph Michael Rainsbury

Attorney at MILES & STOCKBRIDGE PC

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Thomas M. Wolf

Attorney at MILES & STOCKBRIDGE PC

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ]. Number of days granted: 14. Response brief due 07/20/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000760404] [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 06/19/2020 09:47 AM]

#20

(#20) MOTION by PJM Interconnection, LLC to extend filing time for response brief until July 20, 2020.. Date and method of service: 06/18/2020 ecf. [1000760142] [20-1483] Jeffrey Lamken [Entered: 06/18/2020 04:43 PM]

#19

(#19) Corrected BRIEF by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000751575] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:24 AM]

#18

(#18) Errata sheet for paper briefs by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. Identify brief: OPENING. Corrected electronic brief must be filed separately by counsel. [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:18 AM]

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative and PJM Interconnection, LLC. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. [1000750647] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:45 PM]

#15

(#15) CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by PJM Interconnection, LLC. [20-1483] Jeffrey Lamken [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:39 AM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert M. Rolfe for PJM Interconnection, LLC. [1000735961] [20-1483] Robert Rolfe [Entered: 05/08/2020 11:41 AM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian A. Wright for PJM Interconnection, LLC. [1000735958] [20-1483] Brian Wright [Entered: 05/08/2020 11:38 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey A. Lamken for PJM Interconnection, LLC. [1000735842] [20-1483] Jeffrey Lamken [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:10 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas M. Wolf for Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [1000735379] [20-1483] Thomas Wolf [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:33 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John M. Robb, III for Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [1000735375] [20-1483] John Robb [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:27 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000735364] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:15 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph M. Rainsbury for Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [1000735353] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:04 PM]

#4

(#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 05/07/2020 01:59 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kenneth Stout. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/03/2020. Response Brief due 07/06/2020. [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:29 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00233-MHL. Mailed to: Kenneth Stout. [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:24 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00233-MHL. Mailed to: Kenneth Stout. [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:24 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ]. Number of days granted: 14. Response brief due 07/20/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000760404] [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 06/19/2020 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION by PJM Interconnection, LLC to extend filing time for response brief until July 20, 2020.. Date and method of service: 06/18/2020 ecf. [1000760142] [20-1483] Jeffrey Lamken [Entered: 06/18/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Corrected BRIEF by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000751575] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Errata sheet for paper briefs by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. Identify brief: OPENING. Corrected electronic brief must be filed separately by counsel. [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) BRIEF by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000750648] [20-1483]--[Edited 06/05/2020 by RJL-See ECF 19] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative and PJM Interconnection, LLC. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. [1000750647] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by PJM Interconnection, LLC. [20-1483] Jeffrey Lamken [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert M. Rolfe for PJM Interconnection, LLC. [1000735961] [20-1483] Robert Rolfe [Entered: 05/08/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian A. Wright for PJM Interconnection, LLC. [1000735958] [20-1483] Brian Wright [Entered: 05/08/2020 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lucas M. Walker for PJM Interconnection, LLC. [1000735911] [20-1483] Lucas Walker [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PJM Interconnection, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000735844] [20-1483] Jeffrey Lamken [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey A. Lamken for PJM Interconnection, LLC. [1000735842] [20-1483] Jeffrey Lamken [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas M. Wolf for Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [1000735379] [20-1483] Thomas Wolf [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John M. Robb, III for Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [1000735375] [20-1483] John Robb [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000735364] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph M. Rainsbury for Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [1000735353] [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative. [20-1483] Joseph Rainsbury [Entered: 05/07/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kenneth Stout. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/03/2020. Response Brief due 07/06/2020. [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00233-MHL. Mailed to: Kenneth Stout. [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00233-MHL. Case manager: Rachel Lee. [20-1483] RJL [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less