This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2021 at 06:15:22 (UTC).

OJ Commerce, LLC, et al v. KidKraft, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 OJ Commerce, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against KidKraft, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11521

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

OJ COMMERCE, LLC

NAOMI HOME, INC.

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellees

MIDOCEAN PARTNERS IV, L.P.

KIDKRAFT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Carl Edward Goldfarb

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

401 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Mark A. Schweikert

Attorney at Schweikert Law, PLLC

1111 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1550

Miami, FL 33131

Robert George Keefe

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

Shlomo Y. Hecht

Attorney at Shlomo Y. Hecht, PA

3076 N Commerce Pkwy

Pembroke Pines, FL 33025

Devin Freedman

Attorney at Roche Freedman, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 5500

Miami, FL 33131

Constantine Philip Economides

Attorney at Roche Freedman, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 5500

Miami, FL 33131

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Gerard Andrew Tuzzio

Attorney at Roberts Reynolds Bedard & Tuzzio

7501 Wiles Rd Ste 201

Coral Springs, FL 33067

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joshua Lipton

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave Nw Fl 3

Washington, DC 20036

Lawrence D. Silverman

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

98 Se 7Th St Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33173

Alexandra Milagros Mora

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

98 Se 7Th St Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33173

Scott K. Hvidt

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

2001 Ross Ave Ste 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Lawrence Dean Silverman

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

98 Se 7Th St Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33173

Barbara Joy Riesberg

Attorney at RiesbergLaw

2601 S Bayshore Dr Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Order, DE # 255

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including July 14, 2021 in which to file Appellants brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 9400769-2 ] RSR [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 07/14/2021 filed by Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [9400769-1] [21-11521] (ECF: Devin Freedman) [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alexandra Milagros Mora for Appellees KidKraft, Inc. and MidOcean Partners IV, L.P.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11521] (ECF: Alexandra Mora) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Alexandra Milagros Mora for Appellees KidKraft, Inc. and MidOcean Partners IV, L.P.. [21-11521] (ECF: Alexandra Mora) [Entered: 05/26/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/24/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua Lipton for KidKraft, Inc. and MidOcean Partners IV, L.P.. [21-11521] (ECF: Joshua Lipton) [Entered: 05/20/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Joshua Lipton is GRANTED. (CK) [9390306-2] [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Joshua Lipton for Appellees KidKraft, Inc. and MidOcean Partners IV, L.P. [9390306-1] [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC. The appellants' brief is due on or before 06/14/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants' brief. [Entered: 05/18/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [21-11521] (ECF: Lawrence Silverman) [Entered: 05/18/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Devin Freedman for Appellants OJ Commerce, LLC and Naomi Home, Inc.. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 05/18/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Devin Freedman for Appellants Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-11521] (ECF: Devin Freedman) [Entered: 05/17/2021 05:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of deficient Transcript Order Form filed by Devin Freedman for OJ Commerce, LLC and Naomi Home, Inc.. Document Not Complete because it states there were no hearings. However, the DC docket reflects there were hearings. Counsel must file a corrected Transcript Order form. [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexandra Milagros Mora for KidKraft, Inc. and MidOcean Partners IV, L.P.. [21-11521] (ECF: Alexandra Mora) [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Devin Freedman for Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC. [21-11521] (ECF: Devin Freedman) [Entered: 05/17/2021 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Devin Freedman for Appellants Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC. No hearings. [21-11521] (ECF: Devin Freedman) [Entered: 05/17/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Devin Freedman for Appellants Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11521] (ECF: Devin Freedman) [Entered: 05/17/2021 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Devin Freedman for Appellants Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC. [21-11521] (ECF: Devin Freedman) [Entered: 05/17/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Naomi Home, Inc. and OJ Commerce, LLC on 04/29/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/18/2021 as to Appellant OJ Commerce, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/01/2021 as to Appellee KidKraft, Inc. [Entered: 05/05/2021 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OJ Commerce, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandra M. Mora

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence D. Silverman