This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/10/2022 at 06:00:45 (UTC).

Bestwall LLC v. Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Bestwall LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1127

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellants and Defendant / Appellants

OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF ASBESTOS CLAIMANTS

FUTURE CLAIMS REPRESENTATIVE

Defendants

SANDER L. ESSERMAN, IN HIS CAPACITY AS FUTURE CLAIMS REPRESENTATIVE

THOSE PARTIES LISTED ON APPENDIX A TO COMPLAINT

JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-1000

Debtor / Appellees and Plaintiff / Appellees

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

BESTWALL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Mark Raymond Kutny

Attorney at HAMILTON, STEPHENS, STEELE & MARTIN, PLLC

525 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Natalie Diane Ramsey

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE LLP

1201 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Linda Wright Simpson

P. O. Box 33127

Charlotte, NC 28233

Glenn C. Thompson

525 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Judy Darlean Thompson

P. O. Box 33127

Charlotte, NC 28233

Davis Lee Wright

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE LLP

1201 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Edwin J. Harron

Rodney Square North, P. O. Box 391

Wilmington, DE 19899-0391

Felton Edward Parrish

1420 East 7Th Street

Charlotte, NC 28204

Sharon M. Zieg

Rodney Square North, P. O. Box 391

Wilmington, DE 19899-0391

Debtor / Appellee and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ross Fulton

Attorney at RAYBURN, COOPER & DURHAM, PA

227 West Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-0000

Mark P. Goodman

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

M. Natasha Labovitz

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

John R. Miller Jr.

Attorney at RAYBURN, COOPER & DURHAM, PA

227 West Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-0000

Garland Stuart Cassada

101 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28246

Jeffrey Brian Ellman

1420 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3053

David M. Schilli

101 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28246

Andrew W.J. Tarr Esq.

101 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28246

Mark Pierre Goodman

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Miriam Natasha Labovitz

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

C. Kevin Marshall

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 28 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 05/18/2022. Response brief due 06/17/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001142710] [22-1127, 22-1135] KH [Entered: 04/08/2022 12:27 PM]

#28

(#28) MOTION by Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127, Sander L. Esserman, in his capacity as Future Claimants Representative in 22-1135 to extend filing time for opening brief Appellants' Joint Brief and the Joint Appendix - scheduling conflicts and COVID until May 18, 2022.. Date and method of service: 04/07/2022 ecf. [1001142014] [22-1127, 22-1135] Mark Kutny [Entered: 04/07/2022 10:40 AM]

#27

(#27) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001124826] Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/18/2022. Response Brief due 05/18/2022 [22-1127, 22-1135] KH [Entered: 03/09/2022 05:53 PM]

#26

(#26) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas J. Donlon for Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127. [1001119424] [22-1127, 22-1135] Thomas Donlon [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:55 PM]

#25

(#25) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by M. Natasha Labovitz for Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001119393] [22-1127, 22-1135] Miriam Labovitz [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:48 PM]

#24

(#24) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark P. Goodman for Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001119381] [22-1127, 22-1135] Mark Goodman [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:44 PM]

#23

(#23) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bestwall LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001117670] [22-1127, 22-1135] C. Marshall [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:32 PM]

#22

(#22) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Kevin Marshall for Bestwall LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001117668] [22-1127, 22-1135] C. Marshall [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:30 PM]

#21

(#21) Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark R. Kutny for Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127. [1001117664] [22-1127, 22-1135] Mark Kutny [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:17 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Felton Parrish for Sander L. Esserman, in his capacity as Future Claimants Representative in 22-1135. [1001117542] [22-1127, 22-1135] Felton Parrish [Entered: 02/25/2022 03:19 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John R. Miller, Jr. for Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001117431] [22-1127, 22-1135] John Miller [Entered: 02/25/2022 01:47 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001117423] [22-1127, 22-1135] Ross Fulton [Entered: 02/25/2022 01:37 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Natalie D. Ramsey for Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127. [1001117351] [22-1127, 22-1135] Natalie Ramsey [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:40 PM]

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/SERVICE LIST by Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. Related documents: [ # 4 ] appearance of counsel [1001117323] [22-1127, 22-1135] Ross Fulton [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:17 PM]

#4

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/SERVICE LIST by Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. Related documents: [ # 4 ] appearance of counsel [1001117323] [22-1127, 22-1135] Ross Fulton [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:17 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00103-RJC,17-31795,17-03105. Mailed to: Ellman, Goodman, Labovitz,Thompson. [1001109183] [22-1127] KH [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:22 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00103-RJC,17-31795,17-03105. Mailed to: Ellman, Goodman, Labovitz,Thompson. [1001109183] [22-1127] KH [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:22 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 22-1135 with 22-1127. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Ellman, Labovitz, Thompson, Goodman. [1001109232] [22-1127, 22-1135] KH [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:44 PM]

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 28 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 05/18/2022. Response brief due 06/17/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001142710] [22-1127, 22-1135] KH [Entered: 04/08/2022 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION by Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127, Sander L. Esserman, in his capacity as Future Claimants Representative in 22-1135 to extend filing time for opening brief Appellants' Joint Brief and the Joint Appendix - scheduling conflicts and COVID until May 18, 2022.. Date and method of service: 04/07/2022 ecf. [1001142014] [22-1127, 22-1135] Mark Kutny [Entered: 04/07/2022 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001124826] Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/18/2022. Response Brief due 05/18/2022 [22-1127, 22-1135] KH [Entered: 03/09/2022 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas J. Donlon for Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127. [1001119424] [22-1127, 22-1135] Thomas Donlon [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by M. Natasha Labovitz for Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001119393] [22-1127, 22-1135] Miriam Labovitz [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark P. Goodman for Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001119381] [22-1127, 22-1135] Mark Goodman [Entered: 03/01/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bestwall LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001117670] [22-1127, 22-1135] C. Marshall [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Kevin Marshall for Bestwall LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001117668] [22-1127, 22-1135] C. Marshall [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark R. Kutny for Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127. [1001117664] [22-1127, 22-1135] Mark Kutny [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark R. Kutny for Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127. [1001117647] [22-1127, 22-1135] Mark Kutny [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sander L. Esserman, in his capacity as Future Claimants Representative in 22-1135. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001117544] [22-1127, 22-1135] Felton Parrish [Entered: 02/25/2022 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Felton Parrish for Sander L. Esserman, in his capacity as Future Claimants Representative in 22-1135. [1001117542] [22-1127, 22-1135] Felton Parrish [Entered: 02/25/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John R. Miller, Jr. for Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001117431] [22-1127, 22-1135] John Miller [Entered: 02/25/2022 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001117423] [22-1127, 22-1135] Ross Fulton [Entered: 02/25/2022 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Natalie D. Ramsey for Official Committee of Asbestos Claimants in 22-1127. [1001117351] [22-1127, 22-1135] Natalie Ramsey [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/SERVICE LIST by Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. Related documents: [ # 4 ] appearance of counsel [1001117323] [22-1127, 22-1135] Ross Fulton [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ross R. Fulton for Georgia-Pacific LLC in 22-1127, 22-1135. [1001117298] [22-1127, 22-1135] Ross Fulton [Entered: 02/25/2022 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 22-1135 with 22-1127. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Ellman, Labovitz, Thompson, Goodman. [1001109232] [22-1127, 22-1135] KH [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00103-RJC,17-31795,17-03105. Mailed to: Ellman, Goodman, Labovitz,Thompson. [1001109183] [22-1127] KH [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00103-RJC,17-31795,17-03105. Case manager: KHancock. [1001109176] [22-1127] KH [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bestwall LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark P. Goodman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C Kevin Marshall