This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 06:05:59 (UTC).

O'Connor v. City of New York

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 O'Connor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-396

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

City of New York, DBA New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

Patrick O'Connor

East Meadow, NY 11554

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Zachary W. Carter

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Tahirih Mehrie Sadrieh

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Patrick O'Connor

428 Avalon Place

East Meadow, NY 11554

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM & ORDER, dated 01/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2497673] [19-396] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:41 AM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2497674] [19-396] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:42 AM]

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2497680] [19-396] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:44 AM]

#5

(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, district court receipt # 4653137521, FILED.[2507078] [19-396] [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:06 PM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 03/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 3/26/2019, unless Appellant Patrick O'Connor, submits Form D-P, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2510324] [19-396] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:32 AM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE, to Appellee City of New York , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2510341] [19-396] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:36 AM]

#26

(#26) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, copy to pro se appellant, ASSIGNED.[2531399] [19-396] [Entered: 04/03/2019 08:56 AM]

#23

(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by hand delivery.[2531289] [19-396] [Entered: 04/02/2019 05:06 PM]

#22

(#22) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by hand delivery.[2531281] [19-396] [Entered: 04/02/2019 05:03 PM]

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by hand delivery.[2527957] [19-396] [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:10 PM]

17 #2

Supporting Document

17 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as substitute counsel, [15], on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED.[2518063] [19-396] [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:41 AM]

#14

(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as substitute counsel, [13], on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED.[2516278] [19-396] [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:56 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, copy to pro se appellant, ASSIGNED.[2531399] [19-396] [Entered: 04/03/2019 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by hand delivery.[2531289] [19-396] [Entered: 04/02/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by hand delivery.[2531281] [19-396] [Entered: 04/02/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by hand delivery.[2527957] [19-396] [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED.[2521061] [19-396] [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ATTORNEY, Tahirih M. Sadrieh, [ # 17 ], in place of attorney Zachary W. Carter, SUBSTITUTED.[2521060] [19-396] [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED. Service date 03/12/2019 by US mail. [2520867] [19-396] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as substitute counsel, [15], on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED.[2518063] [19-396] [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED. Service date 03/12/2019 by US mail. [2517379] [19-396] [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as substitute counsel, [13], on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED.[2516278] [19-396] [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, FILED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2516118] [19-396] [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER, dated 03/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 3/26/2019, unless Appellant Patrick O'Connor, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2510346] [19-396] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE, to Appellee City of New York , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2510341] [19-396] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 03/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 3/26/2019, unless Appellant Patrick O'Connor, submits Form D-P, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2510324] [19-396] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2507079] [19-396] [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, district court receipt # 4653137521, FILED.[2507078] [19-396] [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2497680] [19-396] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2497674] [19-396] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM & ORDER, dated 01/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2497673] [19-396] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Patrick O'Connor, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED. [2497670] [19-396] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.