This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 12:03:26 (UTC).

Oceana, Inc. v. Gina Raimondo, et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 Oceana, Inc filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Gina Raimondo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5120

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Gina Raimondo, in her official capacity as Secretary of Commerce

National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration

National Marine Fisheries Service

Plaintiff / Appellant

Oceana, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Michael T. Gray

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

701 San Marco Boulevard.

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen Daniel Mashuda

Attorney at Earthjustice

810 Third Avenue, Suite 610

Seattle, WA 98104-1711

Brettny E. Hardy

Attorney at Earthjustice

50 California Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrea Arnold Treece

Attorney at Earthjustice

50 California Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Open Document

JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1908126] to Reset Briefing Deadlines filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/28/2021 ] Length Certification: 178 Words. [21-5120] (Hardy, Brettny) [Entered: 07/28/2021 07:08 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

AMENDED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1905002] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/02/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/02/2021 03:03 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1904973] filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA and Gina Raimondo [Service Date: 07/02/2021 ] [21-5120] (Gray, Michael) [Entered: 07/02/2021 01:26 PM]

Open Document #4

Memorandum Opinion (ECF No. 86) dated 3.30.21

Open Document #3

Order (ECF No. 85) dated 3.30.21

Open Document #2

Memorandum Opinion (ECF No. 51) dated 3.11.19

Open Document #1

Order (ECF No. 50) dated 3.11.19

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1904796] submitted by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:22 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1904795] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:22 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1904794] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:20 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1904793] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:19 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1904791] filed by Stephen D. Mashuda and co-counsel Andrea A. Treece, Brettny E. Hardy on behalf of Appellant Oceana, Inc.. [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:17 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1904790] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:14 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1904788] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:08 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1902618] filed by Michael T. Gray on behalf of Appellees National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA and Gina Raimondo. [21-5120] (Gray, Michael) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:57 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1901061] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/19/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/02/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/02/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/02/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/19/2021 [21-5120] [Entered: 06/02/2021 03:02 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1908126] to Reset Briefing Deadlines filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/28/2021 ] Length Certification: 178 Words. [21-5120] (Hardy, Brettny) [Entered: 07/28/2021 07:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1907952] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/07/2021. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/07/2021. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/28/2021. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/04/2021. Final Briefs due 11/18/2021. [21-5120] [Entered: 07/27/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1905002] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/02/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/02/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1904973] filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA and Gina Raimondo [Service Date: 07/02/2021 ] [21-5120] (Gray, Michael) [Entered: 07/02/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENT [1904932] to UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [ # 1904796-2 ] filed by Oceana, Inc. [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1904796] submitted by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1904795] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1904794] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1904793] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1904791] filed by Stephen D. Mashuda and co-counsel Andrea A. Treece, Brettny E. Hardy on behalf of Appellant Oceana, Inc.. [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1904790] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1904788] filed by Oceana, Inc. [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [21-5120] (Mashuda, Stephen) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1902618] filed by Michael T. Gray on behalf of Appellees National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA and Gina Raimondo. [21-5120] (Gray, Michael) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1901061] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/02/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/19/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/02/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/02/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/02/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/19/2021 [21-5120] [Entered: 06/02/2021 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1901057] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-00829-CRC filed by Oceana, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5120. [21-5120] [Entered: 06/02/2021 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-5120] [Entered: 06/02/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration is a litigant

Latest cases where OCEANA OCEANFRONT DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brettny Hardy